Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSea Shepherd Legal v. Department of the Interior
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2018cv01387
Date Filed2018-09-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James L. Robart
PlaintiffSea Shepherd Legal
Case DescriptionSea Shepherd Legal submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Interior for records concerning the agency's review of three Pacific island national monuments. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency told Sea Shepherd Legal that it could not respond within the statutory time limit. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Sea Shepherd Legal filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Interior an agency of the United States
DefendantDepartment of the Interior an agency of the United States
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Opinion/Order [15]
Opinion/Order [17]
Opinion/Order [19]
Opinion/Order [21]
Opinion/Order [25]
Opinion/Order [27]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-09-201COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5479386) Attorney Brett Wade Sommermeyer added to party Sea Shepherd Legal(pty:pla), filed by Sea Shepherd Legal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sommermeyer, Brett) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
2018-09-202ERRATA re 1 Complaint, to correct typographical error in address and telephone number by Plaintiff Sea Shepherd Legal (Sommermeyer, Brett) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
2018-09-203CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Sea Shepherd Legal (Sommermeyer, Brett) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
2018-09-204PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re 1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Sea Shepherd Legal (Attachments: # 1 Summons US Attorney -- WD Wash., # 2 Summons USAG)(Sommermeyer, Brett) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
2018-09-21Judge James L. Robart added. (ST) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
2018-09-215Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) U.S. Department of Interior (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(ST) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
2018-10-086AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to U.S. Attorney for the Western District of Washington on 9/24/2018, filed by Plaintiff Sea Shepherd Legal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Sommermeyer, Brett) (Entered: 10/08/2018)
2018-10-107AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Department of the Interior on 9/26/2018, filed by Plaintiff Sea Shepherd Legal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Sommermeyer, Brett) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
2018-10-108AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to United States Attorney General on 10/10/2018, filed by Plaintiff Sea Shepherd Legal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Sommermeyer, Brett) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
2018-10-239NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michelle R. Lambert on behalf of Defendant Department of the Interior. (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-10-2310ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Department of the Interior.(Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-11-0211ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 12/7/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/16/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/30/2018. (AD) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
2018-11-1612STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to extend time re discovery by parties (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-11-1613STIPULATION AND ORDER for Extension of Time re parties' 12 Stipulation: FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/14/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/28/2018, Joint Status Report due by 1/4/2019, by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-12-1214STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to extend time re discovery by parties re 13 Stipulation and Order, Set Deadlines (Sommermeyer, Brett) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
2018-12-2615STIPULATION AND ORDER to extend time re discovery re parties' 14 Stipulation. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/11/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/25/2019, Joint Status Report due by 2/1/2019, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
2019-01-0816MOTION to Stay Deadlines , filed by Defendant Department of the Interior. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/8/2019, (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 01/08/2019)
2019-01-0917ORDER granting defendant's 16 Motion to Stay of Deadlines in Light of Lapse in Appropriations. Counsel for government will notify the Court as soon as Congress has approved appropriated funds for the Department of Justice. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (Entered: 01/09/2019)
2019-01-2918NOTICE of Appropriation Received and Proposed Order re resetting deadlines ; filed by Defendant Department of the Interior. (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-01-3019NOTICE of Appropriations Received and ORDER Resetting Deadlines re United States' 18 Notice: FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 2/7/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/21/2019, Joint Status Report due by 2/28/2019, by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
2019-02-2720Stipulated MOTION for Relief from initial discovery and JSR , filed by Defendant Department of the Interior. Noting Date 2/28/2019, (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 02/27/2019)
2019-02-2721STIPULATION AND ORDER for relief from 26(f) Conference, Initial Disclosures and Joint Status Report re parties' 20 Stipulated Motion. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (Entered: 02/27/2019)
2019-04-2522STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER for relief from initial discovery by parties (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 04/25/2019)
2019-05-0323STIPULATION AND ORDER for Relief from 26(f) Conference, Initial Disclosures, and Joint Status Report re parties' 22 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (Entered: 05/03/2019)
2019-06-2524Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Department of the Interior (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 06/25/2019)
2019-06-2525JOINT STATUS REPORT AND ORDER re Dkt. 24 Status Report. Parties request to submit a Joint Status Report within the next 30 days. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (Entered: 06/25/2019)
2019-07-2526JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties (Sommermeyer, Brett) (Entered: 07/25/2019)
2019-08-0627JOINT STATUS REPORT AND ORDER re 26 Joint Status Report. Parties shall submit a Joint Status Report within the next 60 days. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (Entered: 08/06/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar