Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe University of Washington et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2018cv01396
Date Filed2018-09-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Barbara J. Rothstein
PlaintiffThe University of Washington a Washington state agency
PlaintiffThe Center for Human Rights at The University of Washington a research center created by state law
PlaintiffAngelina Godoy director of the Center
Case DescriptionThe Center for Human Rights at the University of Washington submitted 12 FOIA requests to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning the human rights impact of federal immigration enforcement in the State of Washington. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but had only responded to two of the requests when the University filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
DefendantUnited States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DefendantUS Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DefendantUnited States Customs and Border Protection
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Opinion/Order [43]
Opinion/Order [55]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-09-211COMPLAINT against defendant(s) United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Receipt # 0981-5481227) Attorney Jordan Clark added to party Angelina Godoy(pty:pla), Attorney Jordan Clark added to party The Center for Human Rights at The University of Washington(pty:pla), Attorney Jordan Clark added to party The University of Washington(pty:pla), filed by The University of Washington, Angelina Godoy, The Center for Human Rights at The University of Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-KK, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Clark, Jordan) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
2018-09-24Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (CDA) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
2018-09-242Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(CDA) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
2018-10-023APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Thomas R. Burke FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Angelina Godoy, The Center for Human Rights at The University of Washington, The University of Washington (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5493492 (Clark, Jordan) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
2018-10-024ORDER re 3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Thomas R Burke for Plaintiffs Angelina Godoy, The Center for Human Rights at The University of Washington, and for The University of Washington, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (DS) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
2018-10-165CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiffs Angelina Godoy, The Center for Human Rights at The University of Washington, The University of Washington re 2 Summons Issued, 1 Complaint,, to U.S. Dept. of Homeland Security (Clark, Jordan) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-10-166CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiffs Angelina Godoy, The Center for Human Rights at The University of Washington, The University of Washington re 2 Summons Issued, 1 Complaint,, to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Clark, Jordan) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-10-297CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Angelina Godoy, The Center for Human Rights at The University of Washington, The University of Washington (Clark, Jordan) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
2018-11-148PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiffs Angelina Godoy, The Center for Human Rights at The University of Washington, The University of Washington (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(Clark, Jordan) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
2018-11-159Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Attachments: # 1 US Attorney's Office, Washington D.C)(AE) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
2018-11-2910NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Jordan Clark. Filed by Plaintiffs Angelina Godoy, The Center for Human Rights at The University of Washington, The University of Washington. (Clark, Jordan) Modified firm address on 11/29/2018 (DS). (Entered: 11/29/2018)
2018-11-3011NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michelle R. Lambert on behalf of Defendants United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 11/30/2018)
2018-11-3012NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge, The Hon. Brian A. Tsuchida, if this form is not returned by 12/7/2018. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KMP) (Entered: 11/30/2018)
2018-12-0313MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by William M. McCool. Case reassigned to Judge Barbara J. Rothstein for all further proceedings. Hon. Brian A Tsuchida no longer assigned to case. cc to BJR. (AE) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
2018-12-0414ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 1/15/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/2/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/8/2019, by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (LW) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-1715ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, by United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
2019-01-0816Unopposed MOTION to Stay Deadlines , filed by Defendants United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/8/2019, (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 01/08/2019)
2019-01-1417MINUTE ORDER: The United States' 16 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Deadlines is GRANTED. All pending deadlines are STAYED and EXTENDED commensurate with duration of the lapse in appropriations. The Government shall notify the Court once appropriations have been received. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (LW) (Entered: 01/14/2019)
2019-01-2918NOTICE of Appropriations Rec'd and Proposed Order re resetting deadlines ; filed by Defendants US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-01-3019MINUTE ORDER re 18 Notice of Appropriations Rec'd and Order re resetting deadlines . Joint Status Report due by 2/15/2019 now that government funding is restored. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (TH) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
2019-02-1320Stipulated MOTION for Relief of 26(F) Conference, Initial Disclosures and Joint Status Report , filed by Plaintiffs Angelina Godoy, The Center for Human Rights at The University of Washington, The University of Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/13/2019, (Clark, Jordan) (Entered: 02/13/2019)
2019-03-1121ORDER granting 20 stipulated motion for relief from initial disclosure and discovery plan deadline. A Joint Status Report is due by 3/29/2019. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.(RM) (Entered: 03/11/2019)
2019-03-2922JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 1. (Clark, Jordan) (Entered: 03/29/2019)
2019-04-0123MINUTE ORDER: After review of the parties joint status report, the Court grants the parties request for additional time to resolve outstanding issues. The next joint status report is due no later than 5/13/2019. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM) (Entered: 04/01/2019)
2019-05-1324JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 3. (Clark, Jordan) (Entered: 05/13/2019)
2019-05-1425MINUTE ORDER: After review of the parties joint status report, the Court grants the parties request for additional time to resolve outstanding issues. The next joint status report is due no later than 6/27/2019. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (TH) (Entered: 05/14/2019)
2019-06-0326STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM) (Entered: 06/03/2019)
2019-06-2727Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs Angelina Godoy, The Center for Human Rights at The University of Washington, The University of Washington (Clark, Jordan) (Entered: 06/27/2019)
2019-07-0128MINUTE ORDER: After review of the joint status report filed 6/27/2019, the parties shall file an updated joint status report no later than 8/12/2019. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM) (Entered: 07/01/2019)
2019-08-1229JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 1. (Clark, Jordan) (Entered: 08/12/2019)
2019-08-1530MINUTE ORDER: The Court has reviewed the joint status report submitted by counsel 29 . In that report counsel jointly request an additional 45 days during which they intend to resolve outstanding concerns. The Court will GRANT the request and order the filing of the next joint status report on or before September 26, 2019. The Court expects that by the time of the next report the parties will have materially progressed with resolution of the matter. So ordered. Signed by Judge Barbara Jacobs Rothstein on August 15, 2019. (RM) (Entered: 08/15/2019)
2019-09-2631Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 09/26/2019)
2019-09-2732MINUTE ORDER: The Court has reviewed the joint status report submitted by counsel 31 . In that report counsel jointly request an additional 60 days during which they intend to resolve outstanding concerns. The Court will GRANT the request and order the filing of the next joint status report on or before November 25, 2019. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM) (Entered: 09/27/2019)
2019-11-2533Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 11/25/2019)
2019-11-2734MINUTE ORDER: The Court has reviewed the joint status report submitted by counsel 33 . In that report counsel jointly request an additional 60 days during which they intend to resolve outstanding concerns. The Court will GRANT the request and order the filing of the next joint status report on or before January 24, 2020. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM) (Entered: 11/27/2019)
2020-01-2435JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 1. (Clark, Jordan) (Entered: 01/24/2020)
2020-01-2936MINUTE ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' Joint Status Report [Dkt. No. 35] pursuant to the Court's November 27, 2019 order [Dkt. No. 34]. The Court accepts the parties' briefing schedule where Plaintiffs' Brief is due no later than February 14, 2020; ICE's Response is due no later than March 2, 2020; and Plaintiffs' Reply Brief is due no later than March 9, 2020. The parties are shall file another joint status report on or before March 24, 2020. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM) (Entered: 01/29/2020)
2020-02-1437MOTION to Compel Defendant ICE to Search For and Produce Forms I-213 , filed by Plaintiffs Angelina Godoy, The Center for Human Rights at The University of Washington, The University of Washington. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/13/2020, (Clark, Jordan) (Entered: 02/14/2020)
2020-02-2738STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to extend time to respond by parties (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 02/27/2020)
2020-03-0239MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of parties' Stipulated Motion to Extend time to Respond. Dkt. No. 38 . The Parties having so stipulated and agreed, the Court hereby ORDERS that ICE's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel (Dkt. No. 37 ) is due no later than March 13, 2020; and Plaintiffs' Reply is due no later than March 20, 2020. The motion is noted for March 20, 2020. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (PM) (Entered: 03/02/2020)
2020-03-1340RESPONSE, by Defendant US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, to 37 MOTION to Compel Defendant ICE to Search For and Produce Forms I-213 . (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 03/13/2020)
2020-03-1341DECLARATION of Fuentes filed by Defendant US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re 37 MOTION to Compel Defendant ICE to Search For and Produce Forms I-213 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-7)(Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 03/13/2020)
2020-03-1842Stipulated MOTION to extend time to Reply , filed by Plaintiffs Angelina Godoy, The Center for Human Rights at The University of Washington, The University of Washington. Noting Date 3/18/2020, (Clark, Jordan) (Entered: 03/18/2020)
2020-03-1943STIPULATION AND ORDER to extend time to Reply re parties' 42 Stipulated Motion. The Court hereby ORDERS that UWCHR'S reply brief is due no later than March 30, 2020. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (TH) (Entered: 03/19/2020)
2020-03-2444JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 1. (Clark, Jordan) (Entered: 03/24/2020)
2020-03-3045REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Angelina Godoy, The Center for Human Rights at The University of Washington, The University of Washington, TO RESPONSE to 37 MOTION to Compel Defendant ICE to Search For and Produce Forms I-213 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Clark, Jordan) (Entered: 03/30/2020)
2020-03-3046DECLARATION of Jordan Clark filed by Plaintiffs Angelina Godoy, The Center for Human Rights at The University of Washington, The University of Washington re 37 MOTION to Compel Defendant ICE to Search For and Produce Forms I-213 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Clark, Jordan) (Entered: 03/30/2020)
2020-04-0147NOTICE of Intent to file a Surreply ; filed by Defendants US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 04/01/2020)
2020-04-0248MOTION for Leave to File Surreply , filed by Defendant US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Surreply, # 2 Exhibit Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/2/2020, (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 04/02/2020)
2020-04-0249MINUTE ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendant ICE's motion seeking leave to file a surreply [Dkt. No. 48 ]. Finding good cause, the Court hereby GRANTS this motion and allows Defendant ICE to file this motion. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (TH) (Entered: 04/02/2020)
2020-04-0250SURREPLY filed by Defendants US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security re 37 MOTION to Compel Defendant ICE to Search For and Produce Forms I-213 and re 45 REPLY (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 04/02/2020)
2020-04-0351RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Angelina Godoy, The Center for Human Rights at The University of Washington, The University of Washington re 50 Surreply, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Proposed Order)(Clark, Jordan) (Entered: 04/03/2020)
2020-04-2152ORDER granting Plaintiff's 37 Motion to Compel Defendant ICE to Search For and Produce Forms I-213 . The parties are hereby ordered to meet and confer, within 10 days of issuance of this order, to discuss and narrow the terms of the request as discussed herein. The parties are further directed to file a brief Joint Status Report, advising the Court whether an agreement as to production (including its scope and any agreed deadlines) according to the terms of this order has been reached, within 15 days of issuance of this order. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (TH) (Entered: 04/21/2020)
2020-05-0453JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 1. (Clark, Jordan) (Entered: 05/04/2020)
2020-05-0454STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER regarding Defendant ICE's Production of Forms I-213 by parties (Clark, Jordan) (Entered: 05/04/2020)
2020-05-0755STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding Defendant ICE's Production of Forms I-213 re parties' 54 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (TH) (Entered: 05/07/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar