Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHendricks v. US Department of Justice
DistrictCentral District of Illinois
CitySpringfield
Case Number3:2018cv03246
Date Filed2018-09-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Richard Mills
PlaintiffJerry Lee Hendricks
Case DescriptionJerry Hendricks, a federal prisoner, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning his conviction. The agency disclosed 21 pages, with redactions on three pages, and withheld 160 pages entirely under Exemption 3 (other statutes). Hendricks filed an administrative appeal of the decision, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, he filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUS Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-09-241COMPLAINT against US Department of Justice filed by Jerry Lee Hendricks. (MJC, ilcd) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-10-162MOTION for Order by Plaintiff Jerry Lee Hendricks. Responses due by 10/30/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2)(GL, ilcd) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar