Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSalomone v. United States Congress Office of Compliance
DistrictNorthern District of Georgia
CityAtlanta
Case Number1:2018cv04496
Date Filed2018-09-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Steve C. Jones
PlaintiffWilliam Salomone, Jr.
Case DescriptionWilliam Salomone submitted a request to the U.S. Congress Office of Compliance for records concerning payments made to cover up sexual abuse, harassment and other misconduct. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. Congress is not subject to FOIA and, as a result, this is not a FOIA claim.
Complaint issues: FOIA mentioned only tangentially

DefendantUnited States Congress Office of Compliance
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-09-261COMPLAINT filed by William Salomone, Jr.. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 106437) (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit - J. B. Sessions, # 2 Affidavit - Susan T. Grundman, # 3 Affidavit - Byung J. Pak, # 4 Affidavit - Civil Process Clerk, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-10-182MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by United States Congress Office of Compliance. (Coty, Darcy) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-293RESPONSE in Opposition re 2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by William Salomone, Jr. (rjs) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
2018-11-20Submission of 2 MOTION to Dismiss to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs) (Entered: 11/20/2018)
2018-12-264Administrative Order Staying Civil Proceedings in Light of Lapse of Appropriations. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/26/2018. (rjs) (Entered: 12/27/2018)
2018-12-27Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to William Salomone, Jr. re 4 Order Staying Case. (rjs) (Entered: 12/27/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar