Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTHEHUFFINGTONPOST.COM, INC. v. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02253
Date Filed2018-09-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffTHEHUFFINGTONPOST.COM, INC.
Case DescriptionHuffingtonPost.com submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for arrest records of undocumented aliens from December 2016 through December 2017. HuffingtonPost also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and asked HuffingtonPost for clarification. HuffingtonPost provided clarification to the agency. After hearing nothing further from the agency, HuffingtonPost filed an administrative appeal of the denial of expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, HuffingtonPost filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-09-281COMPLAINT against U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5710705) filed by THEHUFFINGTONPOST.COM, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
2018-09-282LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by THEHUFFINGTONPOST.COM, INC. (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
2018-10-01Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zrdj) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
2018-10-013SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
2018-10-024STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/2/18. (lctnm1) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
2018-10-225NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Todd Cohen on behalf of U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar