Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBhambra v. Administrative Office of the Federal Courts of the United States et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CityOakland
Case Number4:2018cv05681
Date Filed2018-09-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jeffrey S. White
PlaintiffHarjit Bhambra
DefendantAdministrative Office of the Federal Courts of the United States Article III Judges Division, Thurgood Marshall Federal Judiciary Building, One Columbus Circle, NE, Washington, D.C. 20544
DefendantClerk of the District Court of the United States for the Northern District of California 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, California 94102
DefendantSusan Y. Soong Clerk of Court, United States District Court for the Northern District of California, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, CA 94102
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-09-171COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Administrative Office of the Federal Courts of the United States, Clerk of the District Court of the United States for the Northern District of California & Susan Y. Soong, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 34611136794). Filed byHarjit Bhambra. Consent/Declination due by 10/1/2018. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet, #(2) Filing Fee Receipt) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2018) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-09-172Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/10/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2018 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 15, 18th Floor. (Attachments: #(1) Standing Order for Mag. Judge Sallie Kim, #(2) Standing Order for All Judges) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2018) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-09-173Summons Issued as to Defendants Administrative Office of the Federal Courts of the United States, Clerk of the District Court of the United States for the Northern District of California & Susan Y. Soong. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2018) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-09-174SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Harjit Bhambra, Served Upon Susan Y. Soong, Clerk of the District Court of the United States for the Northern District of California served on 9/17/2018. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2018) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-09-245FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory & Injunctive Relief; Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Harjit Bhambra. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/25/2018: # 1 [Proposed] Summons) (tnS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/25/2018)
2018-09-246CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Harjit Bhambra. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2018) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
2018-09-257Summons on First Amended Complaint Issued as to Administrative Office of the Federal Courts of the United States, Clerk of the District Court of the United States for the Northern District of California, Susan Y. Soong. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2018) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
2018-09-268CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 9/26/2018, a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2018) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
2018-09-269ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case Reassigned to Judge Jeffrey S. White. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/26/18. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2018) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
2018-10-0110ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/1/18. Case Management Statement due by 12/14/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/21/2018 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (Certificate of Service attached)(jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
2018-10-0911CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Harjit Bhambra. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar