Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBruce v. Government National Mortgage Association et al
DistrictDistrict of South Carolina
CityCharleston
Case Number2:2018cv02635
Date Filed2018-09-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable Bruce Howe Hendricks
PlaintiffNelson L Bruce
Case DescriptionNelson Bruce submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Treasury, the Department of Housing and Urban Development, and the Federal Reserve for records concerning FR-2046 forms received by the agencies from certain organizations. HUD responded to some of Bruce's requests, primarily with no records responses. After hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, Bruce filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantGovernment National Mortgage Association Ginnie Mae
DefendantFederal Reserve Bank of Richmond Charlotte Office
DefendantFederal Reserve Bank of Richmond Charlotte Office
TERMINATED: 12/07/2018
DefendantUS Department of Housing and Urban Development HUD
DefendantFederal Housing Administration FHA
DefendantUS Department of the Treasury
DefendantUnited States of America
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-09-261COMPLAINT against Federal Housing Administration, Federal Reserve Bank of Richmond, Government National Mortgage Association, US Department of Housing and Urban Development, US Department of the Treasury, filed by Nelson L Bruce. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits)(ssam, ) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-09-263MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Nelson L Bruce. Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(ssam, ) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-09-287PROPER FORM ORDER. Case to be brought into proper form by 10/19/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 9/28/2018. (cwhi, ) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
2018-09-288REFERENCE 7 ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 9/28/2018.(cwhi, ) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
2018-09-289***DOCUMENT MAILED 7 Proper Form Order, and required documents placed in U.S. Mail to Nelson L Bruce. (cwhi, ) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
2018-11-0512ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk and directing plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 11/5/2018. (ssam, ) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
2018-11-0513***DOCUMENT MAILED 12 Order Service - Non-Inmate placed in U.S. Mail to Nelson L Bruce (ssam, ) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
2018-11-0514Summons Issued as to Federal Housing Administration, Federal Reserve Bank of Richmond, Government National Mortgage Association, US Department of Housing and Urban Development, US Department of the Treasury. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Service due by 2/4/2019. (ssam, ) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
2018-11-2917SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nelson L Bruce. U.S. Attorney General served on 11/21/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Certified Mail Receipt) (hada, ) Modified docket text on 12/21/2018 (hada, ). (Entered: 11/29/2018)
2018-11-2918SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nelson L Bruce. Federal Reserve Bank of Richmond served on 11/19/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Certified Mail Receipt) (hada, ) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
2018-11-2921SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nelson L Bruce. Government National Mortgage Association served on 11/29/2018, answer due 12/20/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Certified Mail Receipt) (hada, ) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-0719NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Nelson L Bruce (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter, # 2 Envelope)(hada, ) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-1022MOTION to Dismiss by Federal Reserve Bank of Richmond. Response to Motion due by 12/27/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Declaration of Keith Goodwin)No proposed order.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Abney, Merritt) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-1023MOTION to Dismiss by Federal Reserve Bank of Richmond. Response to Motion due by 12/27/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Abney, Merritt) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-1124TEXT ORDER finding as moot 22 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 23 Motion to Dismiss. On December 7, 2018, Plaintiff filed a notice of voluntary dismissal, in which he voluntarily dismissed his claims against Defendant Federal Reserve Bank of Richmond. (Dkt. No. 19.) Federal Reserve Bank of Richmond was then terminated from this action in accordance with Plaintiff's notice. Because Federal Reserve Bank of Richmond is no longer a party to this action, its pending motions to dismiss are MOOT. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 12/11/18.(akob, ) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
2018-12-1125***DOCUMENT MAILED 24 Order on Motion to Dismiss, placed in U.S. Mail to Nelson L Bruce. (hada, ) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
2018-12-2126TEXT ORDER. The docket reflects that the Summons and Complaint were served on Defendant Government National Mortgage Association on November 29, 2018 21 , and on the remaining Defendants (U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development, Federal Housing Administration, and US Department of Treasury) on November 21, 2018 17 . However, no responsive pleading has been filed by any of these Defendants, and the deadline to do so has expired. Nevertheless, the Court will allow additional time, until January 14, 2019, for these Defendants to file either an Answer or other responsive pleading. If no action is taken by these Defendants, a default could be entered against them pursuant to Rule 55, Fed. R. Civ. P. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail this Text Order to the addresses listed on the Summonses for these Defendants and to also mail a copy of the Summons and Complaint and this Text Order to the United States Attorney's Office located in Charleston, South Carolina.IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 12/21/2018. (hada, ) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
2018-12-2127***DOCUMENT MAILED 26 Order, placed in U.S. Mail to Nelson L Bruce. (hada, ) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
2018-12-2128***DOCUMENT MAILED 26 Order, placed in U.S. Mail to Government National Mortgage Association (7007 0220 0004 0679 1964), US Department of Housing and Urban Development (7007 0220 0004 0679 1995), Federal Housing Administration (7007 0220 0004 0679 1988), US Department of the Treasury 97007 0220 0004 0679 1971). (hada, ) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
2018-12-2129***DOCUMENT MAILED 26 Order, 14 Summons and 1 Complaint, placed in U.S. Mail to U.S. Attorneys Office (7007 0220 0004 0679 2008). (hada, ) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
2018-12-2830CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT re 26 Order, 14 Summons and 1 Complaint, served on U.S. Attorneys's Office on 12/26/2018. (hada, ) (Entered: 12/28/2018)
2019-01-1432MOTION to Stay by United States of America. Response to Motion due by 1/28/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Bowens, Barbara) (Entered: 01/14/2019)
2019-01-1533TEXT ORDER granting 32 Motion to Stay. Defendant is instructed to file a status report on the issue of service within five days after the partial government shutdown concludes. IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 1/15/19.(akob, ) (Entered: 01/15/2019)
2019-01-1634***DOCUMENT MAILED 33 Order on Motion to Stay, placed in U.S. Mail to Nelson L Bruce (hada, ) (Entered: 01/16/2019)
2019-01-2435SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nelson L Bruce. United States of America served on 1/18/2019, answer due 2/8/2019. (hada, ) (Entered: 01/25/2019)
2019-01-2936STATUS REPORT by United States of America. (Bowens, Barbara) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-01-2937MOTION for Extension of Time by Federal Housing Administration, Government National Mortgage Association, US Department of Housing and Urban Development. Response to Motion due by 2/12/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Bowens, Barbara) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-01-3038ORDER granting in part 37 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants Government National Mortgage Association, U.S. Dept. of Housing and Urban Development, and Federal Housing Admin. must file an Answer or otherwise respond by March 1, 2019.Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 1/30/19.(akob, ) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
2019-01-3039TEXT ORDER. Defendants' 36 Status Report states that the Department of Justice has "resumed its usual civil litigation functions." Accordingly, the Court lifts the Stay in this matter. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 1/30/19. (akob, ) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
2019-01-3140***DOCUMENT MAILED 38 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 39 Order, placed in U.S. Mail to Nelson L Bruce (hada, ) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-01-3141ORDER. The Clerk of Court is directed to re-issue the summons for the Defendant United States Department of Treasury. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 01/31/2019. (hada, ) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-01-3142***DOCUMENT MAILED 41 Order placed in U.S. Mail to Nelson L. Bruce (hada, ) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-01-3143Summons RE-Issued as to US Department of the Treasury. Service due by 5/1/2019. (hada, ) (Main Document 43 with correct document replaced on 1/31/2019) (hada, ). (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-01-3145SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nelson L Bruce. USM note: PS FM3811 signed, copy was not returned to the sender. (hada, ) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-01-3146SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nelson L Bruce. Federal Housing Administration served on 11/20/2018, answer due 1/22/2019; US Department of Housing and Urban Development served on 11/20/2018, answer due 1/22/2019. (hada, ) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-03-0147ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Federal Housing Administration, Federal Reserve Bank of Richmond, Government National Mortgage Association, US Department of Housing and Urban Development, US Department of the Treasury, United States of America.(Bowens, Barbara) (Entered: 03/01/2019)
2019-03-0448SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 4/3/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 5/3/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 6/3/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 6/3/2019, Discovery due by 7/3/2019, Motions due by 9/3/2019, Mediation Due by 8/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 03/04/2019. (hada, ) (Entered: 03/04/2019)
2019-03-0449***DOCUMENT MAILED 48 Scheduling Order, placed in U.S. Mail to Nelson L Bruce. (hada, ) (Entered: 03/04/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar