Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMAYO-SMITH v. VETERANS HEALTH ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02274
Date Filed2018-10-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffMICHAEL F. MAYO-SMITH M.D.
Case DescriptionMichael Mayo-Smith submitted a FOIA request to the Veterans Health Administration for records concerning an Office of Accountability and Whistleblower Protection report on the Manchester, New Hampshire VA Medical Center. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Mayo-Smith filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantVETERANS HEALTH ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-011COMPLAINT against VETERANS HEALTH ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5715505) filed by MICHAEL F. MAYO-SMITH. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
2018-10-03Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zmd) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
2018-10-032SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to VETERANS HEALTH ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
2018-11-133ANSWER to Complaint by VETERANS HEALTH ADMINISTRATION.(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
2018-11-13MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by November 27, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/13/2018. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
2018-11-134Amended ANSWER to Complaint by VETERANS HEALTH ADMINISTRATION.(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar