Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02276
Date Filed2018-10-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted two FOIAs request to the Department of Defense for records concerning POW/MIAs missing in Vietnam and Laos. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-011COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Fee Status: Receipt Number 0090-5714840 ) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of Defense)(Lee, Eric) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
2018-10-022LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Lee, Eric) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
2018-10-03Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zmd) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
2018-10-033SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
2018-10-044STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/04/2018. (lctnm2) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
2018-10-175RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/17/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/16/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/15/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 10/15/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Lee, Eric) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-10-306NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda Lisa Campbell on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar