Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe Human Rights Defense Center et al v. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services et al
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2018cv01442
Date Filed2018-10-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James L. Robart
PlaintiffThe Human Rights Defense Center
PlaintiffMichelle Dillon
Case DescriptionMichelle Dillon on behalf of the Human Rights Defense Center submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Health and Human Services for records of litigation against the agency since 2010 that resulted in awards of $1,000 or more. Dillon also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. Dillon submitted a second FOIA request to the Administration for Children and Families for records concerning Sexual Abuse/Significant Incident Reports. Dillon also requested a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further, Dillon and the Human Rights Defense Center filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Health and Human Services
DefendantAdministration for Children and Families
DefendantOffice of Refugee Resettlement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Opinion/Order [16]
Opinion/Order [19]
Opinion/Order [23]
Opinion/Order [25]
Opinion/Order [27]
Opinion/Order [31]
Opinion/Order [33]
Opinion/Order [35]
Opinion/Order [38]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-011COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5492451) Attorney Jeremy E Roller added to party Michelle Dillon(pty:pla), Attorney Jeremy E Roller added to party The Human Rights Defense Center(pty:pla), filed by The Human Rights Defense Center, Michelle Dillon. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons (U.S. Department of Health and Human Services), # 3 Summons (Administration for Children and Families), # 4 Summons (Office of Refugee Resettlement))(Roller, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
2018-10-02Judge James L. Robart added. (DJ) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
2018-10-02NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) The Human Rights Defense Center must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 10/9/2018. (DJ) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
2018-10-022Summons(es) electronically issued as to defendant(s) Administration for Children and Families, Office of Refugee Resettlement, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(DJ) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
2018-10-033CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by The Human Rights Defense Center (Roller, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
2018-10-044APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Deborah M. Golden FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Michelle Dillon, The Human Rights Defense Center (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5495958 (Roller, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
2018-10-045ORDER re 4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Deborah M Golden for Plaintiffs Michelle Dillon and The Human Rights Defense Center, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (DS) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
2018-10-106AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on U.S. Dept. of Health & Human Services on 10/3/2018, filed by Plaintiffs Michelle Dillon, The Human Rights Defense Center. (Roller, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
2018-10-107AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Administration for Children and Families on 10/3/2018, filed by Plaintiffs Michelle Dillon, The Human Rights Defense Center. (Roller, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
2018-10-108AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Office of Refugee ReSettlement on 10/3/2018, filed by Plaintiffs Michelle Dillon, The Human Rights Defense Center. (Roller, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
2018-10-109AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to U.S. Dept. of Health & Human Services on 10/4/2018, filed by Plaintiffs Michelle Dillon, The Human Rights Defense Center. (Roller, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
2018-10-1010AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Administration for Children and Families on 10/4/2018, filed by Plaintiffs Michelle Dillon, The Human Rights Defense Center. (Roller, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
2018-10-1011AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Office of Refugee ReSettlement on 10/4/2018, filed by Plaintiffs Michelle Dillon, The Human Rights Defense Center. (Roller, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
2018-11-0112NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michelle R. Lambert on behalf of Defendants Administration for Children and Families, Office of Refugee Resettlement, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
2018-11-0113ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, by Administration for Children and Families, Office of Refugee Resettlement, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services.(Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
2018-11-0214ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 12/7/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/16/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/30/2018. (AD) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
2018-11-2915STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER for Rule 26 relief by parties (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
2018-11-2916ORDER granting parties' 15 stipulated motion asking the court to vacate the deadlines set forth in its November 2, 2018, order 14 . Parties are ordered to submit a Joint Status Report described in their stipulated motion (Dkt. # 15 ) by 1/14/2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
2019-01-0417NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Jeremy E Roller. Filed by Plaintiffs Michelle Dillon, The Human Rights Defense Center. (Roller, Jeremy) Modified firm association and address on 1/7/2019 (DS). (Entered: 01/04/2019)
2019-01-0818Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report , filed by Plaintiffs Michelle Dillon, The Human Rights Defense Center. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Deadline to File Joint Status Report) Noting Date 1/18/2019, (Roller, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/08/2019)
2019-01-1119ORDER granting Plaintiffs' unopposed 18 Motion for Extension of Deadline to File Joint Status Report. Parties are directed to file a joint state report within two weeks after Defendants' counsel's furlough ends. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) (Entered: 01/11/2019)
2019-02-0520Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants Administration for Children and Families, Office of Refugee Resettlement, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 02/05/2019)
2019-02-0621ORDER: Based on the parties' 20 joint status report, the court continues to find good cause to delay the issuance of a scheduling order and ORDERS the parties to submit another joint status report no later than 4/5/2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LW) (Entered: 02/06/2019)
2019-04-0522Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants Administration for Children and Families, Office of Refugee Resettlement, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-1123JOINT STATUS REPORT AND ORDER re Dkt. 22 . Joint Status Report due by 5/6/2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (Entered: 04/11/2019)
2019-05-0624JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 05/06/2019)
2019-05-1425JOINT STATUS REPORT AND ORDER re Dkt. 24 . Parties shall submit a Joint Status Report due by 6/3/2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (Entered: 05/14/2019)
2019-06-0326JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties (Roller, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/03/2019)
2019-06-0427ORDER re 26 Joint Status Report. Parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report by 6/17/2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) (Entered: 06/04/2019)
2019-06-1728JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties (Roller, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/17/2019)
2019-06-1929JOINT STATUS REPORT AND ORDER re Dkt. 28 . Parties shall submit a Joint Status Report by 7/8/2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (Entered: 06/19/2019)
2019-07-0830JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties (Roller, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-1031JOINT STATUS REPORT AND ORDER re Dkt. 30 . Parties shall submit a Joint Status Report on or before 7/22/2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (Entered: 07/10/2019)
2019-07-2232JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties (Roller, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/22/2019)
2019-07-2533JOINT STATUS REPORT AND ORDER re Dkt. 32 . The parties shall submit a Joint Status Report due 8/12/2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (Entered: 07/25/2019)
2019-08-1234Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants Administration for Children and Families, Office of Refugee Resettlement, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 08/12/2019)
2019-08-1535JOINT STATUS REPORT & ORDER re Dkt. 34 . The parties shall submit a joint status report to the Court on or before September 11, 2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart (PM) (Entered: 08/15/2019)
2019-08-2936NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Deborah M Golden for Plaintiffs Michelle Dillon, The Human Rights Defense Center. (Roller, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/29/2019)
2019-09-1037STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Joint Status Report by parties (Roller, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/10/2019)
2019-09-1238JOINT STATUS REPORT AND ORDER re Dkt. 37 . The parties shall submit a Joint Status Report to the Court on or before 10/9/2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (Entered: 09/12/2019)
2019-10-0739APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Masimba Mutamba FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Michelle Dillon, The Human Rights Defense Center (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5954771 (Roller, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/07/2019)
2019-10-0740ORDER re 39 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Masimba Mutamba for Plaintiff Michelle Dillon and for The Human Rights Defense Center, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (DS) (Entered: 10/07/2019)
2019-10-0941STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Joint Status Report by parties (Roller, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-1542JOINT STATUS REPORT AND ORDER re Dkt. 41 . Parties shall submit a Joint Status Report on or before 1/9/2020. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar