Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSCHNEIDER v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02294
Date Filed2018-10-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffBRANDON C. SCHNEIDER
Case DescriptionBrandon Schneider was a Catholic seminarian whose application for a summer chaplaincy required a background check. In follow-up questions related to his background check, Schneider was asked by OPM about allegations that he had admitted to actions taken by Schneider against another agency, but for which charges had never been filed. Schneider was ethically required to inform his seminary of the allegations. As a result, the seminary suspended his studies. Schneider submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice, the Department of State, and the CIA for records about himself. The agencies acknowledged receipt of Schneider's requests, but after hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, Schneider filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-031COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5720456) filed by BRANDON C. SCHNEIDER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Related Case Form, # 3 Summons)(Hodes, Scott) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
2018-10-032NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by BRANDON C. SCHNEIDER. Case related to Case No. 18-cv-474 (DLF). (zmd) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
2018-10-03Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zmd) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
2018-10-033SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
2018-10-194NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda Lisa Campbell on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-10-265RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/10/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/9/2018. (Hodes, Scott) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-10-266RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/10/2018. (Hodes, Scott) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-10-267RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 10/10/2018 (Hodes, Scott) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-10-268RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 10/11/2018 (Hodes, Scott) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-10-269RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 10/10/2018 (Hodes, Scott) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-11-0910ANSWER to Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar