Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY v. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02303
Date Filed2018-10-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffCENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY
Case DescriptionThe Center for Public Integrity submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning instances in which individuals were physically searched by CBP agents at airports or other ports of entry. After hearing nothing further from the agency, CPI filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-051COMPLAINT against U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5724551) filed by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Defendant, # 3 Summons U.S. Atty, # 4 Summons Atty Gen)(Smith, Peter) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/9/2018) (zjd). (Entered: 10/05/2018)
2018-10-052LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
2018-10-09Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zjd) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
2018-10-093SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zjd) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
2018-10-114RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/10/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/9/2018. (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
2018-10-175RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION served on 10/15/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/15/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USPS Tracking - CBP, # 2 Exhibit USPS Tracking - Atty Gen)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-10-296NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
2018-11-097ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION.(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
2018-11-09MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for an Initial Scheduling Conference on Wednesday, November 28, 2018, at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 21. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall confer in advance of the Initial Scheduling Conference on (1) whether any records can be released, and (2) the proper next steps in this litigation. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/9/2018. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
2018-11-09Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/28/2018 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (dot) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
2018-11-28Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 11/28/2018. Joint Status Report due by 1/18/2019. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
2019-01-188Consent MOTION to Stay (Defendant's Consent Motion to Stay Proceedings in Light of Lapse of Appropriations) by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 01/18/2019)
2019-01-21MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's motion to stay, Dkt. 8 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Within 14 days of Congress appropriating funds for the Department of Justice, the parties shall submit a joint status report. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/21/2019. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 01/21/2019)
2019-02-089Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY. (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 02/08/2019)
2019-02-11MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 9 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before March 8, 2019. It is further ORDERED that, in light of the restoration of funding, this case is hereby UNSTAYED. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/11/2019. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 02/11/2019)
2019-02-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/8/2019. (kt) (Entered: 02/11/2019)
2019-03-0810Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 03/08/2019)
2019-03-12MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 10 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further status report on or before April 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/12/2019. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 03/12/2019)
2019-03-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/18/2019. (kt) (Entered: 03/12/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar