Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNorthwest Environmental Advocates v. Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service
DistrictDistrict of Oregon
CityPortland
Case Number3:2018cv01777
Date Filed2018-10-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Marco A. Hernandez
PlaintiffNorthwest Environmental Advocates an Oregon non-profit corporation
DefendantAnimal and Plant Health Inspection Service an agency of the United States of America
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-051Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5584129 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Northwest Environmental Advocates against Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons). (Bruden, Emma) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
2018-10-052Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Northwest Environmental Advocates. (Bruden, Emma) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
2018-10-093Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Marco A. Hernandez and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 2/6/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/8/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 3/8/2019. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jtj) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
2018-10-094Summons Issued Electronically as to Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jtj) (jtj). (Entered: 10/09/2018)
2018-10-165Notice to Counsel: Judge Hernandez expects the vast majority of civil cases in which all parties are represented by counsel, to be tried within 18 months of the date of filing. Additional information about case scheduling and guidelines for civil cases assigned to Judge Hernandez may be found on his page on the U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon website: https://ord.uscourts.gov/index.php/court-info/judges/judge-hernandez. (jp) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-11-196Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, 4 upon Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service served on 10/11/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) Filed by Northwest Environmental Advocates. (Bruden, Emma) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
2018-11-197Certificate of Service by Northwest Environmental Advocates Filed by Northwest Environmental Advocates. (Bruden, Emma) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
2018-11-198Notice of Appearance of Kevin C. Danielson appearing on behalf of Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service Filed by on behalf of Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service. (Danielson, Kevin) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
2018-11-199Joint Motion for Revised Case Schedule . Filed by Northwest Environmental Advocates. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Bruden, Emma) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
2018-11-2510ORDER: Revising Case Schedule 9 . A Joint Status Report is due by 2/1/2019. Signed on 11/25/2018 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp) (Entered: 11/26/2018)
2019-01-1611Unopposed Motion for Stay of Case Deadlines in Light of Lapse of Appropriations . Filed by Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service. (Danielson, Kevin) (Entered: 01/16/2019)
2019-01-1712ORDER: Denying Motion for Stay 11 . Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp) (Entered: 01/17/2019)
2019-02-1513First Joint Status Report . Filed by Northwest Environmental Advocates. (Bruden, Emma) (Entered: 02/15/2019)
2019-02-2214Scheduling Order by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. Pursuant to the parties' First Joint Status Report 13 , another status report is due by 3/1/2019. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp) (Entered: 02/22/2019)
2019-03-0115Second Joint Status Report . Filed by Northwest Environmental Advocates. (Bruden, Emma) (Entered: 03/01/2019)
2019-03-1516Third Joint Status Report . Filed by Northwest Environmental Advocates. (Bruden, Emma) (Entered: 03/15/2019)
2019-03-2117ORDER: The parties are ordered to file a status report by 3/29/19. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp) (Entered: 03/21/2019)
2019-03-2818Fourth Joint Status Report . Filed by Northwest Environmental Advocates. (Bruden, Emma) (Entered: 03/28/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar