Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleVan Siclen Stocks Firkins v. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CityTacoma
Case Number3:2018cv05827
Date Filed2018-10-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Marsha J. Pechman
PlaintiffVan Siclen Stocks Firkins
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Van Siclen, Stocks & Firkins submitted a FOIA request to the Equal Employment Opportunity Commission for records concerning the investigative file for a complaint filed with the EEOC by their client, Roderick Demmings against Skyline Mail. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the law firm filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantEqual Employment Opportunity Commission
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-111COMPLAINT against defendant) Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Receipt # 0981-5504807), filed by Van Siclen Stocks Firkins.(Messplay, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
2018-10-16Judge Theresa L Fricke added. (CMG) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-10-162NOTICE TO FILER re 1 Complaint: Notice of Filing Deficiency - No Civil Cover Sheet ** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (CMG) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-10-183NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND CONSENT FORM. If declining consent, return the executed form by 12/17/2018. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (TW) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-184ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 1/16/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/2/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/9/2019, If declining consent, return the executed form by 12/17/2018. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (TW) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-185ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (TW) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-18***NOTICE TO PARTIES*** re 3 Consent Form. This district has adopted an opt-out consent procedure. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily CONSENTED to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge UNLESS the consent form is returned by the due date indicating lack of consent. (TW) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-226MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. After review, this matter should have been assigned to the Seattle Division. The case is now assigned to Judge Marsha J. Pechman, Seattle Division, for all further proceedings. All future documents shall bear the following case number: 3:18-cv-05827-MJP. By Traci Whiteley, Deputy Clerk, at the direction of Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke. (TW) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-10-22***As this matter is now assigned to Judge Marsha J. Pechman, the deadlines established by the Notice of Assignment to a US Magistrate Judge and Consent Form 3 and the Joint Status Report 4 issued by Judge Theresa L. Fricke are stricken. (TW) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-11-097CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Plaintiff Van Siclen Stocks Firkins. (Messplay, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar