Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMandell v. SEC Commission et al
DistrictSouthern District of Florida
CityMiami
Case Number1:2018cv24218
Date Filed2018-10-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Darrin P. Gayles
PlaintiffRoss H. Mandell
Case DescriptionRoss Mandell, who was convicted of securities fraud, submitted FOIA requests to the Securities and Exchange Commission and the FBI for records concerning Steven Altman, Mandell's trial attorney who had apparently been an unindicted co-conspirator in Mandell's case. Mandell also requested expedited processing. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. The FBI issued a Glomar response neither confirming nor denying the existence of records and denied Mandell's request for expedited processing. The SEC told Mandell that there were two boxes containing thousands of pages, many of which would have to be reviewed for confidentiality. Mandell filed an administrative appeal of the FBI's decision with the Office of Information Policy. After hearing nothing further from either agency, Mandell filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
DefendantUnited States Department of Justice (DOJ)
DefendantFederal Burean of Investigation (FBI)
DefendantUnited States Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC)
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-121COMPLAINT against DOJ, FBI Headquarters, SEC Commission. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11072590, filed by Ross H. Mandell. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Astor, Mark) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
2018-10-152Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (vmz) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
2018-10-153Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (vmz) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
2018-10-154Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (vmz) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
2018-10-155Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Parties Not Added. The Filer failed to add all parties associated with the case.Filer is instructed to add the additional parties by filing a Notice of Entry of Parties. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (vmz) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
2018-10-156NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 10/15/2018. (isc) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
2018-10-167NOTICE of Change of Address by Mark Gary Astor (Astor, Mark) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-10-168NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Ross H. Mandell (Attachments: # 1 Summon(s), # 2 Summon(s), # 3 Summon(s), # 4 Summon(s), # 5 Summon(s)) (Astor, Mark) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-10-169NOTICE by Ross H. Mandell Civil Cover Sheet (Astor, Mark) Modified text on 10/17/2018 (vmz). (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-10-1710Summons Issued as to Federal Burean of Investigation (FBI), United States Department of Justice (DOJ), United States Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC), U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (vmz) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-10-3111NOTICE by Ross H. Mandell (Astor, Mark) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
2018-10-3112NOTICE by Ross H. Mandell (Astor, Mark) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
2018-10-3113NOTICE by Ross H. Mandell (Astor, Mark) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
2018-10-3114SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed United States Department of Justice served on 10/23/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (See Image DE 11 ) (vmz) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
2018-10-3115Clerks Notice to Filer re 11 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected ; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see 14 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (vmz) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
2018-10-3116SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed United States Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC) served on 10/22/2018, answer due 12/21/2018. ( See image DE 12 ) (vmz) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
2018-10-3117Clerks Notice to Filer re 12 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected ; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see 16 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (vmz) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
2018-10-3118SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed U.S. Attorney General served on 10/23/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. ( See Image DE 13 ) (vmz) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
2018-10-3119Clerks Notice to Filer re 13 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected ; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see 18 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (vmz) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
2018-11-0120SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Ross H. Mandell. Federal Burean of Investigation (FBI) served on 10/23/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (Astor, Mark) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar