Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMabie v. US Attorneys Office et al
DistrictSouthern District of Illinois
CityEast St. Louis
Case Number3:2018cv01939
Date Filed2018-10-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Staci M. Yandle
PlaintiffWilliam Mabie
Case DescriptionWilliam Mabie, a federal prisoner, submitted FOIA requests to the U.S. Attorney's Office for the Eastern District of Missouri, the FBI, and the Bureau of Prisons for records about himself. After hearing nothing further from either agency, Mabie filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUS Attorneys Office EDMO
DefendantFBI
DefendantUS Bureau of Prisons
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-121COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by William Mabie.(cjo) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
2018-10-122MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by William Mabie. (cjo) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
2018-10-123Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle and Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson assigned. All future documents must bear case number 18-1939-SMY-DGW. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to the pro se litigant guide, found on the ILSD website, for further information. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to Plaintiff)(cjo) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
2018-10-304CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (cjo) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
2018-11-285Letter from Plaintiff. (related document 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by William Mabie) (cjo) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
2019-01-086Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty. Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson no longer assigned to the case. (jaj) (Entered: 01/08/2019)
2019-01-107ORDER: Plaintiff has filed a Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis ("IFP") in this case (Doc. 2 ), but has failed to provide the necessary certified prisoner trust fund account information as required by the PLRA to determine whether the inmate is entitled to proceed without prepaying fees and costs. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), the Court must review the prisoner trust fund account statement for the 6 month period immediately preceding the filing of this action. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff shall provide the Clerk of Court with the attached certification completed by the Trust Fund Officer at the facility and a copy of his/her trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent) for the period 3/1/2018 TO 10/12/2018 no later than 45 days from the date of this order. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this action for failure to comply with an Order of this Court. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). See generally Ladien v. Astrachan , 128 F.3d 1051 (7th Cir. 1997); Johnson v. Kamminga , 34 F.3d 466 (7th Cir. 1994). The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order and the certification form to the Trust Fund Officer at United States Penitentiary, Marion. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 1/10/2019. (bps) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 01/10/2019)
2019-02-048Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement filed by William Mabie. (cjo) (Entered: 02/06/2019)
2019-02-259NOTICE of Change of Address by William Mabie rom USP Marion to AUSP Thomson. (jaj) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-03-2810Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by William Mabie. (jaj) (Entered: 03/28/2019)
2019-04-1611ORDER GRANTING 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Clerk of Court to effect service of process. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 4/16/2019. (sgp) (Entered: 04/16/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar