Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBUZZFEED INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02372
Date Filed2018-10-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffBUZZFEED INC.
Case DescriptionBuzzfeed submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of State for records concerning Jared Kushner. Buzzfeed's first FOIA request was for communications from the U.S. Embassy in Israel referencing Kushner, while the second request asked for communications from U.S. Embassies in Saudi Arabia, United Arab Emirates, Israel, Mexico, Venezuela, China, and Japan. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and asked Buzzfeed to clarify the scope of its second request. Buzzfeed did so, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Buzzfeed filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-151COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5738029) filed by BUZZFEED INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet, # 8 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
2018-10-152NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of BUZZFEED INC. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
2018-10-16Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zmd) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-10-163SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-11-134RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 10/30/2018 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
2018-11-135RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/29/2018. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
2018-11-136RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/29/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/28/2018. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar