Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSouthern Environmental Law Center v. Federal Aviation Administration
DistrictNorthern District of Georgia
CityAtlanta
Case Number1:2018cv04763
Date Filed2018-10-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Leigh Martin May
PlaintiffSouthern Environmental Law Center
Case DescriptionThe Southern Environmental Law Center submitted two FOIA requests to the FAA for records concerning the draft environmental impact statement and the hazard analysis for the proposed Spaceport Camden. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, SELC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantFederal Aviation Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-151COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF filed by Southern Environmental Law Center. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8206568) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-10-152Electronic Summons Issued as to Federal Aviation Administration. (bdb) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-10-163Certificate of Interested Persons by Southern Environmental Law Center. (Gist, Brian) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-10-224ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Leigh Martin May for all further proceedings. Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:18-cv-04763-LMM. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 10/22/2018. (tcc) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-10-255STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/25/2018. (btql) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-11-196Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with Brief In Support by Federal Aviation Administration. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Samuel) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
2018-11-197ORDER GRANTING 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. Federal Aviation Administration's Answer due 12/21/2018. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 11/19/2018. (btql) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
2018-12-108AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons , as to Defendant Federal Aviation Administration. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, FAA Packet Tracking, # 2 Exhibit B, Pak Packet Tracking, # 3 Exhibit C, Sessions Packet Tracking)(Gist, Brian) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-219Defendant's ANSWER to 1 COMPLAINT by Federal Aviation Administration. Discovery ends on 5/20/2019.(Williams, Samuel) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 12/21/2018)
2018-12-2610Administrative Order Staying Civil Proceedings in Light of Lapse Appropriations. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/26/18. (btql) (Entered: 12/27/2018)
2019-01-28MINUTE ORDER LIFTING STAY due to appropriations. Approved by Judge Leigh Martin May on 1/28/2019.(rvb) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-03-0811ORDER: Counsel are hereby ORDERED to file the Joint Preliminary Report andDiscovery Plan required by Local Rule 16.2 within 14 days of entry of this Order, or SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to LR 41.3. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 3/8/2019. (btql) (Entered: 03/08/2019)
2019-03-0812Joint MOTION for scheduling order by Federal Aviation Administration. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Samuel) (Entered: 03/08/2019)
2019-03-1113ORDER GRANTING 12 Motion for Scheduling Order. See Order for more details. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 3/8/2019. (btql) (Entered: 03/11/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar