Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleACLU of Southern California v. United States Department of Homeland Security
DistrictCentral District of California
CityWestern Division - Los Angeles
Case Number2:2018cv08917
Date Filed2018-10-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John A. Kronstadt
PlaintiffACLU of Southern California
Case DescriptionThe ACLU of Southern California filed a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security and its Los Angeles field office for records concerning the practice of Immigration and Customs Enforcement agents of misrepresenting or concealing their identity when conducting law enforcement activities. The ACLU also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted the ACLU's request for a fee waiver. DHS referred the request to the Inspector General's Office. That agency conducted a search and found no responsive records. After hearing nothing further from the Los Angeles field office, the ACLU of Southern California filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-161COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22583829 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff ACLU of Southern California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FOIA Request) (Attorney Matthew D Strugar added to party ACLU of Southern California(pty:pla))(Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-10-162CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff ACLU of Southern California. (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-10-163Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by plaintiff ACLU of Southern California. (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-10-164NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff ACLU of Southern California, (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-10-165CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff ACLU of Southern California (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-10-166NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (esa) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-10-167NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-10-168NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: Please correct the name of the Clerk of the Court. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (esa) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-10-169Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by plaintiff ACLU of Southern California. (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-10-161030 DAY Summons issued re Complaint 1 as to defendant United States Department of Homeland Security. (esa) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-10-1611ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-08917 JAK(JEMx). (rn) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-10-1712STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT . (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (twdb) . (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-11-1413STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to United States Department of Homeland Security answer now due 12/17/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Defendant United States Department of Homeland Security.(Attorney Matthew Jimenez Barragan added to party United States Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft))(Barragan, Matthew) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar