Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNew York Legal Assistance Group v. Board of Immigration Appeals et al
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2018cv09495
Date Filed2018-10-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Paul A. Crotty
PlaintiffNew York Legal Assistance Group
Case DescriptionThe New York Legal Assistance Group submitted a FOIA request to the Executive Office for Immigration Review at the Department of Justice for all unpublished Board of Appeal decisions and asked the agency to post them online. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told NYLAG that its request was too broad to search. NYLAG refused to narrow the scope of its request. EOIR then denied the request, arguing that the BIA decisions were not final opinions. NYLAG filed an administrative appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, NYLAG filed suit.
Complaint issues: Affirmative disclosure, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBoard of Immigration Appeals
DefendantExecutive Office For Immigration Review
DefendantU.S. Department Of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-171COMPLAINT against Board of Immigration Appeals, Executive Office For Immigration Review, U.S. Department Of Justice. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15760435)Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group.(Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-10-172CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-10-173MOTION for Patrick Daniel Llewellyn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15760888. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Patrick D. Llewellyn, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-10-174REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Board of Immigration Appeals, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group. (Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-10-175REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Executive Office for Immigration Review, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group. (Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-10-17>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 3 MOTION for Patrick Daniel Llewellyn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15760888. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-10-176REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Justice, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group. (Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-10-177REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Board of Immigration Appeals (USAO), re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group. (Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-10-178REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Board of Immigration Appeals (Attorney General), re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group. (Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-10-18CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Crotty. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (pc) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-18Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (pc) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-18Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-189NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Danielle Feldman Tarantolo on behalf of New York Legal Assistance Group. (Tarantolo, Danielle) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-1810NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jane Greengold Stevens on behalf of New York Legal Assistance Group. (Stevens, Jane) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-1811FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group.(Tarantolo, Danielle) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-1812ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Board of Immigration Appeals. (pc) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-1813ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Board of Immigration Appeals. (pc) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-1814ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Board of Immigration Appeals. (pc) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-1815ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department Of Justice. (pc) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-1816ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Executive Office For Immigration Review. (pc) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-2217SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE). Board of Immigration Appeals served on 10/22/2018, answer due 11/21/2018. Service was accepted by Hao Jun, Civil Clerk, U.S. Attorney's Office - SDNY. Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group. (Tarantolo, Danielle) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-10-3118ORDER granting 3 Motion for Patrick Daniel Llewellyn to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (dgo) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar