Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBAKER v. CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02403
Date Filed2018-10-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffJOSHUA BAKER
Case DescriptionJoshua Baker, an attorney, submitted a FOIA request to the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau for records concerning the 2015 Civil Investigative Demand issued by the agency to Zillow Group. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Baker that the cost of processing his request would be $35,000. Baker's law firm paid the $35,000. The agency told Baker that his request was placed in the complex queue for processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Baker filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU
1700 G Street NW
Washington, DC 20552
DefendantCONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Opinion/Order [10]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-181COMPLAINT against CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5747480) filed by JOSHUA BAKER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons CFPB, # 3 Summons USAG, # 4 Summons DC USAO)(Porritt, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-18Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zmd) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-10-192MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by JOSHUA BAKER (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Joshua Baker, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Porritt, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-10-233SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-10-234NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of All Defendants (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-10-23MINUTE ORDER: On October 23, 2018, the Court conducted a teleconference with the parties regarding Plaintiff's request for a Preliminary Injunction in his FOIA case. Defense counsel indicated that there are two groups of potentially responsive documents. One group contains approximately 2,700 documents; the other group contains over 600,000 documents. Due to the large number of documents and the complexity of the request, Defense counsel indicated it is unlikely that the documents will be reviewed and disclosed with a Vaughn index by November 2, 2018, the date requested by Plaintiff. The parties report that they will continue discussions in an attempt to narrow and prioritize Plaintiff's FOIA request. While the parties continue their discussions, the Court will set a briefing schedule. The Court ORDERS Defendant to file a response to Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by OCTOBER 29, 2018 at 12:00 p.m. The Court further ORDERS Plaintiff to file a Reply by OCTOBER 30, 2018 at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/23/2018. (lcckk3) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-10-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Response to 2 due by 10/29/2018. Reply due by 10/30/2018. (dot) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
2018-10-295Memorandum in opposition to re 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Raynell Lazier (with exhibits))(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
2018-10-296ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/29/18. (DM) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
2018-10-307REPLY to opposition to motion re 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by JOSHUA BAKER. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Porritt, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
2018-10-308MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jonathan Stern, :Firm- The Rosen Law Firm, P.A., :Address- 275 Madison Avenue, 34th Floor. Phone No. - 212-686-1060. Fax No. - 212-202-3827 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5765945. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JOSHUA BAKER (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Porritt, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
2018-10-31MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 8 Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice with respect to Jonathan Stern, in order for him to appear as counsel for Plaintiff, CONTINGENT on said attorney filing a declaration certifying familiarity with this Court's Local Rules by no later than NOVEMBER 5, 2018. Counsel shall promptly register for this Court's CM/ECF system.Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/31/2018. (lcckk3) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
2018-11-019ORDER denying 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/1/2018. (lcckk3) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
2018-11-0110MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/1/2018. (lcckk3) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
2018-11-01MINUTE ORDER: Understanding that an Answer has yet to be filed, the Court ORDERS Defendant to file a Status Report by NOVEMBER 15, 2018. Using the prioritization of documents set out in Plaintiff's 7 Reply, Defendant's Status Report should provide a timeline indicating how much time it would take for Defendant to process and release on a rolling basis the three groups of documents Plaintiff has identified. See Reply Statement of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, ECF No. 7 , 1-2. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/1/2018. (lcckk3) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
2018-11-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Status Report due by 11/15/2018. (kt) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
2018-11-0511RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Declaration Certifying Familiarity with Local Rules filed by JOSHUA BAKER. (Stern, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar