Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHumane Society of the United States et al v. U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service et al
DistrictEastern District of Virginia
CityAlexandria
Case Number1:2018cv01301
Date Filed2018-10-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Liam O'Grady
PlaintiffHumane Society of the United States
PlaintiffHumane Society International
PlaintiffCenter for Biological Diversity
PlaintiffBorn Free USA
Case DescriptionThe Humane Society, the Center for Biological Diversity, and Born Free USA submitted FOIA requests to U.S. Fish and Wildlife Services for records concerning the importation of African elephant trophies. The organizations asked the agency to post such information online. After the agency failed to do so, the organizations filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Affirmative disclosure, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
DefendantU.S. Department of the Interior
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-181COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6322593.), filed by Humane Society of the United States, Humane Society International, Born Free USA, Center for Biological Diversity. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dvanm, ) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-10-192DOCUMENT REMOVED FILED IN ERROR Proposed Summons re 1 Complaint, US Attorney for the Eastern District of Virginia by Born Free USA, Center for Biological Diversity, Humane Society International, Humane Society of the United States. (Mollen, Neal) (Main Document 2 replaced on 10/22/2018) (dvanm, ). Modified on 10/22/2018 (dvanm, ). (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-10-193DOCUMENT REMOVED FILED IN ERROR Proposed Summons re 1 Complaint, Acting Solicitor, U.S. Department of the Interior by Born Free USA, Center for Biological Diversity, Humane Society International, Humane Society of the United States. (Mollen, Neal) (Main Document 3 replaced on 10/22/2018) (dvanm, ). Modified on 10/22/2018 (dvanm, ). (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-10-194DOCUMENT REMOVED FILED IN ERROR Proposed Summons re 1 Complaint, Acting Director, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service by Born Free USA, Center for Biological Diversity, Humane Society International, Humane Society of the United States. (Mollen, Neal) (Main Document 4 replaced on 10/22/2018) (dvanm, ). Modified on 10/22/2018 (dvanm, ). (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-10-22Notice of Correction re 4 Proposed Summons, 3 Proposed Summons, 2 Proposed Summons. The filing user has been notified that documents 2-4 are incorrectly saved PDF fillable form and has been removed. The filing user was directed to refile the documents. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-10-225Proposed Summons re 1 Complaint, Daniel Jorjani, Principle Deputy Solicitor, U.S. Department of the Interior by Born Free USA, Center for Biological Diversity, Humane Society International, Humane Society of the United States. (Mollen, Neal) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-10-226Proposed Summons re 1 Complaint, G. Zachary Terwilliger, U.S. Attorney for Eastern District of Virginia by Born Free USA, Center for Biological Diversity, Humane Society International, Humane Society of the United States. (Mollen, Neal) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-10-227Proposed Summons re 1 Complaint, James Kurth, Acting Director, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service by Born Free USA, Center for Biological Diversity, Humane Society International, Humane Society of the United States. (Mollen, Neal) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-10-238Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Notice)(dvanm, ) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-11-099SUMMONS Returned Executed as to the Department of the Interior and U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service (dvanm, ) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
2018-11-1310SUMMONS Returned Executed by Humane Society of the United States. U.S. Attorney's Office served on 11/7/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
2018-11-1411Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Charles Patrizia and Certification of Local Counsel Neal Mollen Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6363722. by Born Free USA, Center for Biological Diversity, Humane Society International, Humane Society of the United States. (Mollen, Neal) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
2018-11-1412Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Scott Flicker and Certification of Local Counsel Neal Mollen Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6363738. by Born Free USA, Center for Biological Diversity, Humane Society International, Humane Society of the United States. (Mollen, Neal) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
2018-11-1413Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Noah Simmons and Certification of Local Counsel Neal Mollen Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6363755. by Born Free USA, Center for Biological Diversity, Humane Society International, Humane Society of the United States. (Mollen, Neal) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar