Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSatterlee v. Commissioner of Internal Revenue Service et al
DistrictWestern District of Missouri
CitySpringfield
Case Number6:2018cv03348
Date Filed2018-10-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Roseann Ketchmark
PlaintiffRonald Leroy Satterlee
Case DescriptionRonald Satterlee submitted FOIA requests to the IRS for records concerning notices and demands for his taxes for various years. The agency told him that any notices and demands would have been computer-generated and would not be retained by the agency. Dissatisfied by that answer, Satterlee filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantCommissioner of Internal Revenue Service
ATTN: CC:PA:Br 6/7
1111 Constitution Avenue
NW Washington, D.C. 20224
DefendantInternal Revenue Service
Disclosure - Attn. Ron Mele
135 High Street, M/S 106
Hartford, CT 06103
DefendantDisclosure Officer
Disclosures Services
Room 1054-MT
U.S. Department of the Treasury
Washington, D.C. 20220
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-191PRO SE COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Internal Revenue Service, Disclosure Officer, Internal Revenue Service Ronald Leroy Satterlee Filing fee $400. Service due by 1/17/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Envelope) NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Keller, Jeanne) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-10-192PRO SE MOTION for order Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Preparation of a Vaughn Index filed by Ronald Leroy Satterlee. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/2/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Keller, Jeanne) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-10-22SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner of Internal Revenue Service, Disclosure Officer, Internal Revenue Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Prepared Summonses issued, and returned to Plaintiff via USPS first class mail. NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Keller, Jeanne) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-10-223NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: # 1 MAP General Order). Notice, General Order, and NEF mailed to Plaintiff via USPS first class mail. (Keller, Jeanne) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-10-24RECEIPT number KCMO073635 in the amount of $400.00 issued to Ronald Satterlee. Receipt mailed to Plaintiff. (Keller, Jeanne) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
2018-10-264ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. With the consent of the Honorable Roseann Ketchmark and pursuant to Local Rule 83.9, this case is hereby transferred. Case reassigned to District Judge Roseann Ketchmark for all further proceedings. District Judge M. Douglas Harpool no longer assigned to case Signed on 10/26/18 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Howard, Linda) Modified on 10/26/2018 copy of NEF mailed to pltf (Howard, Linda). (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-11-135Pro Se CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ronald Leroy Satterlee on behalf of Plaintiff Ronald Leroy Satterlee. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)NEF mailed to plaintiff. (Furtak, Rebecca) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar