Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleShelby Eidson v. Department of State
DistrictCentral District of California
CityWestern Division - Los Angeles
Case Number2:2018cv09092
Date Filed2018-10-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge R. Gary Klausner
PlaintiffShelby Eidson
Case DescriptionShelby Eidson submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning a letter from Istanbul Counsel General Charles Hunter to the manager of the Steigenberger Maslak Istanbul hotel concerning allegations of sexual assault. Eidson also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and eventually asked Eidson if she was still interested in her request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Eidson filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of State
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-221COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22622044 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Shelby Eidson. (Attorney Colleen Flynn added to party Shelby Eidson(pty:bkmov))(Flynn, Colleen) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-10-222Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Shelby Eidson. (Flynn, Colleen) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-10-223CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Shelby Eidson. (Flynn, Colleen) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-10-224NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Shelby Eidson, (Flynn, Colleen) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-10-235NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (et) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-10-236NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-10-23760 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendant Department of State. (et) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-10-248STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
2018-11-219STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Department of State answer now due 12/24/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Defendant Department of State.(Attorney Matthew Jimenez Barragan added to party Department of State(pty:dft))(Barragan, Matthew) (Entered: 11/21/2018)
2018-12-2110ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Defendant Department of State.(Barragan, Matthew) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
2019-01-2311ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. A Scheduling Conference has been placed on calendar for April 22, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. The Conference will be held pursuant to F.R.Civ. P. 16(b). Trial counsel must be present and there are no telephonic appearances. Counsel are ordered to file a joint statement providing a brief factual summary of the case, including the claims being asserted. The parties are reminded of their obligations to disclose information and confer on a discovery plan not later than 21 days prior to the scheduling conference, and to file a joint statement with the Court not later than 14 days after they confer, as required by F.R. Civ.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Failure to comply may lead to the imposition of sanctions. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to give notice of the scheduling conference to each party that makes an initial appearance in the action after this date. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/15/2019. (sw) (Entered: 01/23/2019)
2019-04-0812JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT filed by Plaintiff Shelby Eidson. (Flynn, Colleen) (Entered: 04/08/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar