Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD et al v. U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02415
Date Filed2018-10-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
PlaintiffBUZZFEED, INC.
Case DescriptionBuzzFeed reporter Jason Leopold submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security for records containing video, audio, or photographs related to migrants and migrant children, and others seeking asylum. Leopold also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency denied his request for expedited processing but granted him a conditional fee waiver. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement told Leopold that it was unable to edit video footage. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Leopold filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantU.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION
DefendantU.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-221COMPLAINT against U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5751963) filed by JASON LEOPOLD, BUZZFEED INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 8 Summons Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-10-222NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-10-22Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zmd) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
2018-10-243SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zjd) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
2018-10-244STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/24/2018. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
2018-11-285RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION served on 11/7/2018 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
2018-11-286RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 11/6/2018 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
2018-11-287RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 11/7/2018 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
2018-11-288RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 11/19/2018 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
2018-11-289RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/8/2018. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
2018-11-2810RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/8/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/8/2018. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
2018-12-1011ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-11MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for an Initial Scheduling Conference on January 4, 2019, at 10:15 a.m. in Courtroom 21. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall confer in advance of the Initial Scheduling Conference on (1) whether any records can be released, and (2) the proper next steps in this litigation. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/11/2018. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
2018-12-12Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/4/2019, at 10:15 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) Modified on 12/17/2018 to correct date (year)(kt). (Entered: 12/12/2018)
2018-12-2612NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
2018-12-2813Unopposed MOTION to Continue the January 4, 2019, Scheduling Conference by U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Braswell, Marina). (Entered: 12/28/2018)
2018-12-30MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' motion to continue the January 4, 2019 Initial Status Conference and to stay the case, Dkt. 13 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The January 4, 2019 ISC is hereby VACATED and this case shall be stayed until further order of the Court. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and submit a proposed date for an initial status conference as soon as Congress appropriates funding for the Department of Justice to resume work. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/30/2018. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 12/30/2018)
2018-12-31Case STAYED. (kt) (Entered: 12/31/2018)
2019-02-0614Joint STATUS REPORT by BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 02/06/2019)
2019-02-06MINUTE ORDER: Given that funding has been restored for the Department of Justice, it is hereby ORDERED that the stay in this case is lifted. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall appear for an Initial Scheduling Conference on March 6, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 21. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall confer in advance of the Initial Scheduling Conference on (1) whether any records can be released, and (2) the proper next steps in this litigation. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/6/2019. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 02/06/2019)
2019-03-06Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 3/6/2019. Oral motion by Defendant to file an Amended Answer; GRANTED, for the reasons stated on the record. Joint Status Report due by 5/1/2019. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-2015Amended ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 03/20/2019)
2019-03-2516LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 03/25/2019)
2019-05-0117Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 05/01/2019)
2019-05-02MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 17, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall provide the Plaintiff with declarations explaining any searches performed seeking responsive records on or before June 14, 2019, and it is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before June 28, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/2/2019. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 05/02/2019)
2019-05-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants shall provide the Plaintiff with declarations explaining any searches performed seeking responsive records on or before 6/14/2019; Joint Status Report due by 6/28/2019. (kt) (Entered: 05/03/2019)
2019-06-2818Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-07-01MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 18, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a further joint status report on or before July 26, 2019, updating the Court on the status of this case and proposing a schedule for further proceedings, if any. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/1/2019. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 07/01/2019)
2019-07-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/26/2019. (kt) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
2019-07-2619Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 07/26/2019)
2019-08-05MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report 19 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before September 12, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 08/05/2019. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 08/05/2019)
2019-08-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/12/2019. (kt) (Entered: 08/06/2019)
2019-08-0620NOTICE of Appearance by Merrick Jason Wayne on behalf of BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 08/06/2019)
2019-09-1221Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 09/12/2019)
2019-09-13MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 21 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before October 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 09/13/2019. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 09/13/2019)
2019-09-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/30/2019. (kt) (Entered: 09/13/2019)
2019-10-3022Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 10/30/2019)
2019-11-04MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time, Dkt. 22, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The parties' joint status report currently due on or before October 30, 2019, shall now be due on or before November 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/4/2019. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 11/04/2019)
2019-11-1523Joint STATUS REPORT by BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/15/2019)
2019-11-19MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 23, the parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for a status conference on November 21, 2019, at 12:00p.m. in Courtroom 21. The parties should be prepared to discuss the anticipated scope of the parties' proposed briefing, including the nature of the disputes on which the parties have not been able to reach an agreement. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/19/2019. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)
2019-11-1924Unopposed MOTION to Continue Status Conference , Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone by BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/19/2019)
2019-11-20MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Unopposed Motion to Continue Status Conference and for Counsel for Plaintiffs to Appear Telephonically, Dkt. 24, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Status Conference set for November 21, 2019 is hereby VACATED and RESCHEDULED for December 2, 2019, at 3:00p.m, in Courtroom 21. Counsel may elect to appear telephonically. Any counsel who elects to do so shall contact the deputy clerk for instructions. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/20/2019. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 11/20/2019)
2019-11-20Set/Reset Hearings: The Status Conference set for 11/21/2019 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED for 12/2/2019, at 3:00 PM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 11/20/2019)
2019-12-02Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Status Conference held on 12/2/2019. The parties shall sufficiently engage in the exchange of information and file a Joint Status Report by 1/17/2020. Defendants shall provide any further information to Plaintiffs by by 1/31/2020. (Court Reporter: Nancy Meyer.) (kt) (Entered: 12/02/2019)
2020-01-1725Joint STATUS REPORT by BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 01/17/2020)
2020-01-22MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 25, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before February 21, 2020, apprising the Court whether the sole remaining issue has been resolved and identifying the proper next steps in this litigation. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 01/22/2020. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 01/22/2020)
2020-01-23MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the terms of the Court's revised standing order, which is available on the Court's website. Click for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 01/23/2020. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 01/23/2020)
2020-02-2126Joint STATUS REPORT by BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 02/21/2020)
2020-02-25MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 26, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before April 6, 2020, which shall update the Court regarding the status of the processing of Plaintiff's FOIA request, any agreements or issues between the parties and a recommendation for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 02/25/2020. (lcrdm2, ) Modified on 3/6/2020 to edit typo (kt). (Entered: 02/25/2020)
2020-04-0627NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Brenda A. Gonzalez on behalf of U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT Substituting for attorney Marina Utgoff Braswell (Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 04/06/2020)
2020-04-0628Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 04/06/2020)
2020-04-06MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 28, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before June 5, 2020, which shall update the Court regarding the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, and shall propose a recommendation for further proceedings. The parties are further DIRECTED to review the Court's updated Standing Order, see Minute Order (Jan. 23, 2020), including the instructions parties are to follow when briefing motions for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 04/06/2020. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 04/06/2020)
2020-06-0529Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 06/05/2020)
2020-06-0530NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Tilghman on behalf of U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 06/05/2020)
2020-06-09MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 29, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file a short notice setting forth the basis for its anticipated motion for summary judgment on or before June 30, 2020, and Plaintiff shall submit a short notice setting forth its intended response and anticipated cross motion on or before July 7, 2020. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a telephonic pre-motions conference on July 15, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 06/09/2020. (lcrdm2, ) Modified on 6/10/2020 to add "telephonic" hearing(kt). (Entered: 06/09/2020)
2020-06-09ENTERED IN ERROR.....Set/Reset Hearings: Pre-motion Conference set for 7/15/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zcal) Modified on 6/10/2020 hearing to be held telephonically (kt). (Entered: 06/09/2020)
2020-06-0931MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/09/2020)
2020-06-3032NOTICE of Defendant's Basis for its Anticipated Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 06/30/2020)
2020-07-0733RESPONSE re 32 Notice (Other) Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Pre-Motion Filing filed by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/07/2020)
2020-07-09MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the pre-motion conference currently scheduled for July 15, 2020, is VACATED and RESCHEDULED to July 17, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. The parties shall utilize the same teleconference number and access code that was previously circulated to them by the Deputy Clerk. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 07/09/2020. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 07/09/2020)
2020-07-17Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Telephonic Pre-motion Conference held on 7/17/2020. Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion due by 8/28/2020; Plaintiff's Response to Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross Motion due by 10/2/2020; Defendants' Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment And Response to Cross Motion due by 11/6/2020; Plaintiff's Reply to Cross Motion due by 11/20/2020. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt) (Entered: 07/17/2020)
2020-08-1734TRANSCRIPT OF TELEPHONIC PRE-MOTION CONFERENCE before Judge Randolph D. Moss held on July 17, 2020. Page Numbers: 1 - 29. Date of Issuance: August 17, 2020. Court Reporter: Jeff Hook/ Telephone number: 202-354-3373. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order Form For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/7/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/15/2020.(Hook, Jeff) (Entered: 08/17/2020)
2020-08-2635Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 08/26/2020)
2020-08-27MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Defendants' consent motion for extension of time, Dkt. 35 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendants' summary judgment motion currently due on or before August 28, 2020, shall now be due on or before September 11, 2020. Plaintiffs' response and cross motion, currently due on or before October 2, 2020, shall now be due on or before October 16, 2020. Defendants' reply to Plaintiffs' response and response to Plaintiffs' cross motion, currently due on or before November 6, 2020, shall now be due on or before November 20, 2020. And Plaintiffs' reply to Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' cross motion, currently due on or before November 20, 2020, shall now be due on or before December 4, 2020. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 08/27/2020. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 08/27/2020)
2020-09-1136MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 09/11/2020)
2020-10-2337Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Briefing Schedule by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/23/2020)
2020-10-23MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' unopposed motion for an extension of time, Dkt. 37 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' opposition/cross-motion, previously due on or before October 16, 2020, is now due on or before October 30, 2020. Defendants' opposition and reply, previously due on or before November 20, 2020, is now due on or before December 4, 2020. Plaintiffs' reply, previously due on or before December 4, 2020, is now due on or before December 18, 2020. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/23/2020. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 10/23/2020)
2020-10-3038Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Statement of Facts, # 7 Statement of Facts Response to Statement of Facts, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/30/2020)
2020-10-3039Memorandum in opposition to re 36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Statement of Facts, # 6 Statement of Facts Response to Statement of Facts, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/30/2020)
2020-12-0440REPLY to opposition to motion re 36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 12/04/2020)
2020-12-0441Memorandum in opposition to re 38 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Facts, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 12/04/2020)
2020-12-1842REPLY to opposition to motion re 38 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 12/18/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar