Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02419
Date Filed2018-10-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted FOIA requests to the General Services Administration, OMB, the FBI, and the Department of Justice for records concerning three meetings discussing the FBI Headquarters Consolidation Project. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION
DefendantOFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-231COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5753671) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-10-232LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-10-25Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zjd) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-10-253SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zjd) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-10-294ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/29/18. (DM) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar