Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02421
Date Filed2018-10-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Justice. The first FOIA request asked for communications between agency officials and the White House concerning the FBI Headquarters Consolidation Project. The second FOIA request asked for communications between agency officials and the White House concerning Trump International Hotel. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request concerning the FBI consolidation project, but had not acknowledged the request concerning Trump International Hotel by the time American Oversight filed suit. After hearing nothing further pertaining to either request, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-231COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5753762) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-10-232LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-10-25Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zrdj) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-10-253SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-11-154RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/25/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/24/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/31/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 10/31/2018 (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
2018-11-165NOTICE of Appearance by Peter T. Wechsler on behalf of All Defendants (Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-11-166Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-11-16MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time: it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall have until and including December 10, 2018 to file its Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/16/18. (lcrc1) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-11-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 12/10/2018, (tj) (Entered: 11/21/2018)
2018-12-077ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
2018-12-10MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before December 26, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/10/18. (lcrc1) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 12/26/2018 (tj) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-188NOTICE of Appearance by Hart W. Wood on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
2018-12-189Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Briefing Schedule by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wood, Hart) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
2018-12-19MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Joint Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before January 3, 2019. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/19/18. (lcrc1) (Entered: 12/19/2018)
2018-12-2610MOTION to Stay by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
2019-01-0211RESPONSE re 10 MOTION to Stay filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 01/02/2019)
2019-01-25MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Motion to Stay: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is STAYED until appropriations are restored to the Department of Justice. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the proposed briefing schedule previously due on January 3, 2019 shall be due within 14 days after restoration of appropriations. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/25/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 01/25/2019)
2019-01-2812NOTICE of restoration of appropriations by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-02-0813Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 02/08/2019)
2019-02-08MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 13 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report advising the Court further as to the status of this matter by February 20, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/8/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 02/08/2019)
2019-02-2114Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 02/21/2019)
2019-02-2215RESPONSE re 14 Status Report filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 02/22/2019)
2019-02-2516RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Statement filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit plaintiff's statement)(Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-02-2517RESPONSE re 16 Response to Document filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Second Decl. of Cerissa Cafasso, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Second Decl.)(Wood, Hart) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-02-27MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 14 the parties' joint status report, and 15 , 16 , and 17 the parties' responses, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall complete its proposed search by June 14, 2019. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall propose a processing schedule by June 28, 2019. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall file with the Court a declaration supporting the adequacy of the search by July 12, 2019. Plaintiff, should it choose to do so, may move for summary judgment on that issue at any point thereafter. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/27/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 02/27/2019)
2019-02-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed search to be completed by 6/14/2019. Proposed processing Schedule due by 6/28/2019; Declaration due by 7/12/2019. (tj) (Entered: 02/27/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar