Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02423
Date Filed2018-10-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted two FOIA requests to the General Services Administration. The first FOIA request asked for communications between agency officials and the White House concerning the FBI Headquarters Consolidation Project. The second FOIA request asked for communications between agency officials and the White House concerning Trump International Hotel. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. After hearing nothing further pertaining to either request, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Opinion/Order [32]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-231COMPLAINT against U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5753871) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-10-232LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-10-25Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zrdj) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-10-253SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-11-154RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/25/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/24/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/31/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION served on 10/30/2018 (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
2018-11-165NOTICE of Appearance by Peter T. Wechsler on behalf of U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION (Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-11-166Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-11-16MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time: it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall have until and including December 10, 2018 to file its Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/16/18. (lcrc1) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-11-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 12/10/2018, (tj) (Entered: 11/21/2018)
2018-12-077ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION.(Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
2018-12-10MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before December 26, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/10/18. (lcrc1) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 12/26/2018 (tj) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-188NOTICE of Appearance by Hart W. Wood on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
2018-12-189Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Briefing Schedule by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wood, Hart) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
2018-12-19MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Joint Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before January 3, 2019. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/19/18. (lcrc1) (Entered: 12/19/2018)
2018-12-2610MOTION to Stay by U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
2019-01-0211RESPONSE re 10 MOTION to Stay filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 01/02/2019)
2019-01-25MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Motion to Stay: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is STAYED until appropriations are restored to the Department of Justice. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the proposed briefing schedule previously due on January 3, 2019 shall be due within 14 days after restoration of appropriations. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/25/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 01/25/2019)
2019-01-2812NOTICE of restoration of appropriations by U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION (Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-02-0813Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION. (Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 02/08/2019)
2019-02-08MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 13 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report advising the Court further as to the status of this matter by February 27, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/8/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 02/08/2019)
2019-02-2714Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 02/27/2019)
2019-03-1815Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 03/18/2019)
2019-03-18MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 15 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report advising the Court further as to the status of this matter by April 3, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/18/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 03/18/2019)
2019-03-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/3/2019 (tj) (Entered: 03/19/2019)
2019-04-0316Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 04/03/2019)
2019-04-03MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 16 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report advising the Court further as to the status of this matter by May 14, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/3/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 04/03/2019)
2019-04-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 5/14/2019 (tj) (Entered: 04/03/2019)
2019-05-1417Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION. (Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 05/14/2019)
2019-05-14MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 17 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report advising the Court further as to the status of this matter by no later than June 17, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/14/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 05/14/2019)
2019-05-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/17/2019. (tj) (Entered: 05/21/2019)
2019-06-1718Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 06/17/2019)
2019-06-18MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 18 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report advising the Court further as to the status of this matter by no later than July 15, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/18/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 06/18/2019)
2019-07-1519Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 07/15/2019)
2019-07-15MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 19 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report advising the Court further as to the status of this matter by no later than August 15, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/15/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 07/15/2019)
2019-08-1520Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 08/15/2019)
2019-08-15MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 20 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the following briefing schedule shall govern further proceedings in this case: Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment on or before October 1, 2019; Plaintiff shall file its opposition and any cross-motion for summary judgment on or before October 22, 2019; Defendant shall file its reply memorandum and any cross-opposition on or before November 12, 2019; and Plaintiff shall file any reply memorandum on or before November 26, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/15/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 08/15/2019)
2019-08-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 10/22/2019. Response to Cross Motions due by 11/12/2019. Reply to Cross Motions due by 11/26/2019. Summary Judgment motions due by 10/1/2019. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/22/2019. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/12/2019. (tj) (Entered: 08/16/2019)
2019-10-0121MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration Travis Lewis, # 3 Statement of Facts, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 10/01/2019)
2019-10-2222Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Declaration of Hart Wood in Support of Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 Statement of Facts)(Wood, Hart) (Entered: 10/22/2019)
2019-10-2223Memorandum in opposition to re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Hart Wood in Support of Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Statement of Facts)(Wood, Hart) (Entered: 10/22/2019)
2019-10-2324NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. Attorney Cerissa Cafasso terminated. (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 10/23/2019)
2019-11-1225REPLY to opposition to 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Second of Travis Lewis, # 2 Statement of Facts)(Wechsler, Peter); Modified docket entry relationship and text on 11/14/2019 (ztth). (Entered: 11/12/2019)
2019-11-1226Memorandum in opposition to 22 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION. (See Docket Entry 25 to view document) (ztth) (Entered: 11/14/2019)
2019-11-14NOTICE OF ERROR re 25 Reply to opposition to Motion; emailed to peter.wechsler@usdoj.gov, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Two-part docket entry (ztth, ) (Entered: 11/14/2019)
2019-11-2627REPLY to opposition to motion re 22 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 11/26/2019)
2020-03-2328NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Martin M. Tomlinson on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Peter T. Wechsler (Tomlinson, Martin) (Entered: 03/23/2020)
2020-04-1529NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Wood, Hart) (Entered: 04/15/2020)
2020-04-2130NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Wood, Hart) (Entered: 04/21/2020)
2020-08-2831ORDER granting in part and denying in part 21 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 22 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/28/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 08/28/2020)
2020-08-2832MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part 21 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 22 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/28/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 08/28/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar