Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTAYLOR, II v. EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02513
Date Filed2018-10-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffEPHREN W. TAYLOR, II
DefendantEXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEY (EOUSA)
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-18Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 10/18/2018. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmd) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
2018-10-181COMPLAINT against EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEY filed by EPHREN W. TAYLOR, II. (zmd) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
2018-10-182MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by EPHREN W. TAYLOR, II. (zmd) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
2018-10-183PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by EPHREN W. TAYLOR, II. (zmd) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
2018-10-184MOTION to Appoint U.S. Marshals to Serve Summons and Complaint by EPHREN W. TAYLOR, II. (zmd) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
2018-11-055MOTION Under Vaughn v. Rosen to require detailed indexing, justification, and itemization. (zef, ) (Entered: 11/06/2018)
2018-11-066MOTION to Appoint Marshal to serve Summons and Complaint by EPHREN W. TAYLOR, II (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(zrdj) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
2018-12-037ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $100.03 from Prison Account of EPHREN W. TAYLOR, II and granting 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and denying 4 MOTION to Appoint U.S. Marshals to Serve Summons and Complaint (see order for full details). Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/3/2018. (zrdj) (Entered: 12/06/2018)
2018-12-10Case Reassigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (zrdj) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-13MINUTE ORDER denying 5 motion for a Vaughn index without prejudice as the motion is premature. Defendant has not yet been served with the complaint or responded to it, so it is still unknown if there will be any documents withheld on the basis of any privileges or exemptions. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/13/18. (DMK) (Entered: 12/13/2018)
2018-12-178MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis without prepayment of fees or costs by EPHREN W. TAYLOR, II (jf) (Entered: 12/19/2018)
2018-12-179PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by EPHREN W. TAYLOR, II (jf) (Entered: 12/19/2018)
2018-12-20MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 8 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Such relief was granted on December 3, 2018, and an initial partial filing fee was assessed in accordance with the Prison Litigation Reform Act. See Order [Dkt. # 7]. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/20/18.(ah) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
2019-01-17Partial Filing Fee Received from EPHREN W. TAYLOR, II in the amount of $100.03, receipt number: 4616096318. (zrdj) (Entered: 01/18/2019)
2019-01-3110SUMMONS (3) Issued as to EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zef, ) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-04-0111RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEY served on 3/20/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/20/2019. (jf) (Entered: 04/02/2019)
2019-04-1712MOTION for Extension of Time to by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 04/17/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar