Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02537
Date Filed2018-11-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning expenses for the security detail assigned to Robert Mueller. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but denied the request. Judicial Watch filed an administrative appeal, which the FBI also denied. Judicial Watch then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-11-021COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5771933) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of Justice)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
2018-11-022LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
2018-11-02Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zmd) (Entered: 11/06/2018)
2018-11-063SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 11/06/2018)
2018-11-154RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/15/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/15/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/15/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 11/14/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
2018-11-205NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Leeson Sroka on behalf of All Defendants (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 11/20/2018)
2018-12-176NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie Cooper Vigen on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Vigen, Leslie) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
2018-12-177ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Vigen, Leslie) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
2018-12-18MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by January 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/18/2019. (lctjk2) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
2018-12-198NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. Attorney Scott Leeson Sroka terminated. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 12/19/2018)
2019-01-099Unopposed MOTION to Stay by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Vigen, Leslie) (Entered: 01/09/2019)
2019-01-09MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 9 Unopposed Motion to Stay. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's motion is GRANTED. The deadline set forth in the Court's Minute Order of December 18, 2018, to file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by January 11, 2019, is hereby STAYED. It is further ORDERED that, within three days after funding is restored for the Department of Justice, the parties shall file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/9/2019. (lctjk2) (Entered: 01/09/2019)
2019-01-2810Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Joint Proposed Schedule by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vigen, Leslie) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-01-29MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED, for good cause shown, that Defendant's motion is GRANTED. The parties shall file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by February 4, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/29/2019. (lctjk2) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-02-0411PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE (JOINT) by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Vigen, Leslie) (Entered: 02/04/2019)
2019-02-05MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern the filing of dispositive motions in this case: Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment by April 5, 2019; Plaintiff shall file its consolidated opposition to Defendant's motion and any cross-motion for summary judgment by May 6, 2019; Defendant shall file its consolidated reply in support of its motion and opposition to any cross-motion by June 4, 2019; and Plaintiff shall file its reply in support of any cross-motion by June 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 2/5/2019. (lctjk2) (Entered: 02/05/2019)
2019-04-0512MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Exhibit Hardy Declaration, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Vigen, Leslie) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar