Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02543
Date Filed2018-11-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Military Academy at West Point for records concerning former cadet Spencer Rapone and former USMA history professor Rasheed Hosein that contained certain key words. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-11-021COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5772813) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of Defense)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
2018-11-022LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
2018-11-05Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zrdj) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
2018-11-053SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
2018-11-264RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/9/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/9/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/9/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 11/8/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 11/26/2018)
2018-12-105NOTICE of Appearance by Roberto Cesar Martens, Jr on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Martens, Roberto) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-106ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE.(Martens, Roberto) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-11MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before December 26, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/11/18. (lcrc1) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
2018-12-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 12/26/2018 (tj) (Entered: 12/13/2018)
2018-12-217PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE re Order for Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Martens, Roberto) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
2018-12-27MINUTE ORDER adopting 7 the parties' joint proposed briefing schedule: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment on or before February 21, 2019; Plaintiff shall file its opposition to Defendant's motion and its cross-motion for summary judgment on or before March 21, 2019; Defendant shall file its reply in support of its motion and its opposition to Plaintiff's cross-motion on or before April 11, 2019; and Plaintiff shall file its reply in support of its cross-motion on or before April 25, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on December 27, 2018. (lcrc3) (Entered: 12/27/2018)
2018-12-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 3/21/2019. Response to Cross Motions due by 4/11/2019. Reply to Cross Motions due by 4/25/2019. Summary Judgment motions due by 2/21/2019. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/21/2019. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 4/11/2019. (gdf) (Entered: 12/28/2018)
2019-02-088Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Briefing Schedule by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Martens, Roberto) (Entered: 02/08/2019)
2019-02-08MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time: it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment on or before March 21, 2019. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file its opposition to Defendant's motion and its cross-motion for summary judgment on or before April 18, 2019. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall file its reply in support of its motion and its opposition to Plaintiff's cross-motion on or before May 9, 2019. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file its reply in support of its crossmotion on or before May 23, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/8/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 02/08/2019)
2019-03-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 4/18/2019. Response to Cross Motions due by 5/9/2019. Reply to Cross Motions due by 5/23/2019. Summary Judgment motions due by 3/21/2019. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 4/18/2019. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/9/2019. (tj) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-149Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Briefing Schedule by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Martens, Roberto) (Entered: 03/14/2019)
2019-03-14MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time: it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment on or before April 11, 2019; Plaintiff shall file its opposition to Defendant's motion and its cross-motion for summary judgment on or before May 9, 2019; Defendant shall file its reply in support of its motion and its opposition to Plaintiff's cross-motion on or before May 23, 2019; and Plaintiff shall file its reply in support of its cross-motion on or before June 6, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/14/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 03/14/2019)
2019-03-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 4/11/2019. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/9/2019. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/23/2019. Cross Motions due by 5/9/2019. Response to Cross Motions due by 5/23/2019. Reply to Cross Motions due by 6/6/2019. (tj) (Entered: 03/15/2019)
2019-04-1110MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Statement of Facts, # 4 Exhibit 1 (Eichner Declaration), # 5 Exhibit 2 (Letter), # 6 Exhibit 3 (Vaughn Index))(Martens, Roberto) (Entered: 04/11/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar