Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHudson v. Dept. of Revenue and Finance et al
DistrictNorthern District of Illinois
CityChicago
Case Number1:2018cv07333
Date Filed2018-11-02
Date Closed2019-02-11
JudgeHonorable Gary Feinerman
PlaintiffGeorge W. Hudson, Jr. We the People of the United States - Estates/Disabled
DefendantDept. of Revenue and Finance
DefendantDept. of Streets and Sanitations
DefendantCorporation Counsel City of Chicago
DefendantMeyer Cherry and Associates
DefendantSt. Louis Pic-A-Part Auto
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-11-021RECEIVED Complaint and 5 copies by George W. Hudson, Jr. (jh, ) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
2018-11-022CIVIL Cover Sheet. (jh, ) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
2018-11-023PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff George W. Hudson, Jr. (jh, ) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
2018-11-024APPLICATION by Plaintiff George W. Hudson, Jr for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (jh, ) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
2018-11-025MOTION by Plaintiff George W. Hudson, Jr for attorney representation. (jh, ) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
2018-11-068EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Gary Feinerman for all further proceedings puruant to 28 USC 294(b). Honorable Marvin E. Aspen no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/6/2018.(jh, ) (Entered: 11/06/2018)
2018-11-079NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jh, ) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
2018-11-1310MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis 4 is denied without prejudice for failure to answer Question 2B. Plaintiff has until 12/7/2018 to file a renewed in forma pauperis application. If Plaintiff files such an application, he should explain how he is able to clothe, feed, and shelter himself despite receiving no money during the last twelve months. If Plaintiff fails to comply, this case will be dismissed for want of prosecution. Status hearing set for 12/17/2018 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
2018-12-0311APPLICATION by Plaintiff George W. Hudson, Jr for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (bg, ) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-0312NOTICE of Motion by George W. Hudson, Jr for presentment of application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis 11 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 12/7/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Exhibit) (bg, ) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-0513MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis 11 is denied. Plaintiff's in forma pauperis application is materially incomplete in one respect and appears false in another. First, Plaintiff's response to Question 2.B does not estimate his monthly wages from Uber. Second, Plaintiff's response to Question 4.F states that he received less than $200 in public assistance over the past twelve months, yet his affidavit of indigency (Dkt. 12 at 2) avers that he receives "General Assistance, SNAP benefits for food, [and] MIAP a County based program that pays for inpatient hospital services." If Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this suit, he must either file a proper in forma pauperis application or pay the $400.00 filing fee by 1/4/2019. Motion hearing set for 12/10/2018 12 is stricken. Status hearing set for 12/17/2018 10 is stricken and re-set for 1/17/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 12/05/2018)
2018-12-1814APPLICATION by Plaintiff George W. Hudson, Jr for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Exhibits) (jh, ) (Entered: 12/19/2018)
2018-12-1815NOTICE of Motion for Reconsideration by George W. Hudson, Jr. (jh, ) (Entered: 12/19/2018)
2018-12-2016ENTERED in Error (jjr, ) Modified on 12/20/2018 (jjr, ). (Entered: 12/20/2018)
2018-12-2017NOTICE of Correction regarding 16 (jjr, ) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
2018-12-2018MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Plaintiff's in forma pauperis application 14 is granted. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii), the complaint 1 is dismissed without prejudice because it does not state a discernible federal claim against any of the defendants and because the court would relinquish supplemental jurisdiction over the state law claims (there is no diversity of citizenship) pursuant to 28 USC 1367(c)(3) given the stage of the case. Plaintiff has until 1/17/2019 to submit an amended complaint. If Plaintiff does so, the amended complaint must describe precisely what each defendant is alleged to have done to Plaintiff and how Plaintiff was injured. Failure to comply will result in the dismissal with prejudice of this suit. The 1/17/2019 status hearing 13 is stricken and re-set to 2/13/2019 at 9:15 a.m. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
2019-01-1719AMENDED Complaint by George W. Hudson, Jr. (jh, ) (Entered: 01/17/2019)
2019-01-1720NOTICE of Motion by George W. Hudson, Jr. (Exhibits) (jh, ) (Entered: 01/17/2019)
2019-02-1121MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B), the amended complaint 19 is dismissed. The federal claims arising from conduct occurring on or before 11/2/2016 are dismissed with prejudice on statute of limitations grounds, as the limitations period for Plaintiff's federal claims, all arising under 42 U.S.C. 1983, is two years. The federal claims arising from conduct occurring after 11/2/2016, which all pertain to Plaintiff's complaints regarding the conduct of litigation in state court or in federal bankruptcy court, are dismissed without prejudice to Plaintiff pursuing those claims in state court and federal bankruptcy court and without prejudice to Plaintiff pursuing any appeals from those proceedings. The court relinquishes supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's state law claims pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1367(c)(3). Given the opportunity 18 Plaintiff was afforded to replead, and given the nature of his claims and the bases for the dismissals, Plaintiff will not be given a further opportunity to replead. Enter judgment order. The status hearing set for 2/13/2019 16 is stricken. Civil case closed.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 02/11/2019)
2019-02-1122ENTERED JUDGMENT on 2/11/2019.Mailed notice.(jlj, ) (Entered: 02/11/2019)
2019-02-1123MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel 5 is denied as moot.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 02/11/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar