Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBESSON v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02527
Date Filed2018-10-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffDAVID H. BESSON
Case DescriptionDavid Besson submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Commerce for records concerning the Cooperative Research and Development Agreement between Ligado Networks and the National Institute of Standards and Technology. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and withheld some records under Exemption 4 (confidential business information). Benson filed an administrative appeal of the agency's decision, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Benson filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-221COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616095260) filed by DAVID H. BESSON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
2018-10-22SUMMONS Not Issued as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE (jf) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
2018-10-222MOTION to Compel by DAVID H. BESSON (jf) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
2018-10-223MOTION for CM/ECF Password by DAVID H. BESSON (jf) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
2018-11-05MINUTE ORDER granting 3 Motion for CM/ECF User Name and Password. Pro se Plaintiff may obtain a CM/ECF user name and password from the Clerk. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/05/2018. (lcapm1) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
2018-11-05MINUTE ORDER denying 2 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Preparation of a Vaughn Index as premature. Plaintiff may renew the Motion, if appropriate, at a later time. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/05/2018. (lcapm1) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
2018-11-084AMENDED COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE filed by DAVID H. BESSON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 26OCT18 DOC letter denying FOIA appeal)(BESSON, DAVID) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
2018-11-09SUMMONS (3) Issued as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zmd) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar