Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleQui et al v. Cissna
DistrictDistrict of South Carolina
CityCharleston
Case Number2:2018cv02967
Date Filed2018-11-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable David C Norton
PlaintiffTony Qui
PlaintiffChungfang Liu
DefendantL Frank Cissna Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-11-021COMPLAINT against L Frank Cissna ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8088300.), filed by Tony Qui, Chungfang Liu. Service due by 1/31/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: NOID, # 2 Exhibit B: Refusal to Inspect, # 3 Exhibit C: FOIA)(sshe, ) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
2018-11-022Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Chungfang Liu, Tony Qui.(sshe, ) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
2018-11-023Summons Issued as to L Frank Cissna. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (sshe, ) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
2018-11-025MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Chungfang Liu, Tony Qui. Response to Motion due by 11/16/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: # 1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.(Banias, Bradley) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
2018-11-026SUMMONS Returned Executed US Attorney's Office for the District of South Carolina by Tony Qui, Chungfang Liu. L Frank Cissna served on 11/2/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(Banias, Bradley) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
2018-11-027NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2018 12:00 PM in Hon. Sol Blatt, Jr., Courtroom, J. Waties Waring Judicial Cntr, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable David C Norton. (eric, ) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
2018-11-058Joint MOTION Hold the Case in Abeyance by Chungfang Liu, Tony Qui. Response to Motion due by 11/19/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Banias, Bradley) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
2018-11-059ORDER denying 5 Motion for TRO; granting 8 Motion to hold case in abeyance Signed by Honorable David C Norton on November 5, 2018.(kwhe, ) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
2018-11-0510NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J Modica on behalf of L Frank Cissna (Modica, Matthew) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
2018-12-2211NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Matthew J Modica for December 28, 2018 through January 5, 2019 (Modica, Matthew) (Entered: 12/22/2018)
2019-05-0212Second MOTION to Stay Response to Complaint by L Frank Cissna. Response to Motion due by 5/16/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Modica, Matthew) (Entered: 05/02/2019)
2019-05-0613ORDER granting 12 Motion to Stay. ORDERED THAT this case be held in abeyance until August 5, 2019, or if the Defendant provides Plaintiffs a complete response to the Plaintiffs' pending Freedom of Information Act request prior to August, the Parties are ordered to notify the Court and the Plaintiffs will have 30 days to respond to the pending notice. Additional details within order. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 5/6/2019.(jbry, ) (Entered: 05/06/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar