Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC. et al v. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02570
Date Filed2018-11-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffPROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC.
PlaintiffRYAN NOAH SHAPIRO
Case DescriptionProperty of the People and researcher Ryan Shapiro submitted two FOIA requests to the Secret Service for completed forms and agreements pertaining to compliance with the Presidential Protection Assistance Act. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but declined to process one of them on the basis that it did not reasonably describe the records sought. Property of the People and Shapiro filed an administrative appeal of that decision. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Property of the People and Shapiro filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-11-071COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5781632) filed by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
2018-11-072NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. Case related to Case No. 1:18-cv-1045(KBJ). (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
2018-11-073LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
2018-11-08Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zsb) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
2018-11-084SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
2018-11-195GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO FOIA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for processing and production of records, batching motions, and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 11/19/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
2018-11-276ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 11/16/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/14/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/14/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/14/2018.) (Light, Jeffrey) Modified on 11/27/2018 (zjf). (Entered: 11/27/2018)
2018-11-27NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 6 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant, Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General, Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney, was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. with corrected document. (jf) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
2018-11-277RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 11/16/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/14/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/14/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/14/2018. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
2018-12-178ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
2018-12-17MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure, on or before 1/7/2019. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/17/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
2019-01-039Unopposed MOTION to Stay , MOTION for Extension of Time to in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hudak, Brian) (Entered: 01/03/2019)
2019-01-04MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Unopposed Motion to Stay in light of lapse of appropriations. For good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is STAYED. Counsel for Defendant shall notify the Court as soon as Congress has appropriated funds; at that point, the Court will enter an order resetting the applicable deadlines, which will be extended day-for-day with the duration of the lapse in appropriations. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 1/4/2019. (lckbj1) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
2019-01-2810NOTICE by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY re Order on Motion to Stay,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to, (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-02-05MINUTE ORDER. Defendant has provided notice that that an appropriations act providing funding to the Department of Justice for a three-week period of time was enacted on 1/25/2019. (ECF No. 10 .) Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the stay in this matter is lifted, and that the parties shall promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure, on or before on or before 2/11/2019. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 2/5/2019. (lckbj1) (Entered: 02/05/2019)
2019-02-1111Joint STATUS REPORT by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/11/2019)
2019-02-12MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 3/11/2019, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 2/12/2019. (lckbj1) (Entered: 02/12/2019)
2019-03-0112NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Derek S. Hammond on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Benton G. Peterson (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 03/01/2019)
2019-03-1113Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 03/11/2019)
2019-03-12MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 5/13/2019, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 3/12/2019. (lckbj1) (Entered: 03/12/2019)
2019-05-1314Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 05/13/2019)
2019-05-16MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 6/13/2019, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 5/16/2019.(lckbj3) (Entered: 05/16/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar