Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCONNECTICUT RIVER WATERSHED COUNCIL, INC. v. U.S. FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02575
Date Filed2018-11-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffCONNECTICUT RIVER WATERSHED COUNCIL, INC.
doing business as CONNECTICUT RIVER CONSERVANCY
Case DescriptionThe Connecticut River Watershed Council submitted a FOIA request to the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission for records concerning the February 14, 2018 visit by FERC Commissioner Neil Chatterjee to several hydroelectric facilities in Massachusetts. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and released two documents. The agency said it would release more records on a rolling basis, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Council filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION
DefendantU.S. FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-11-081COMPLAINT against U.S. FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5782650) filed by CONNECTICUT RIVER WATERSHED COUNCIL, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex A - FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit Ex B - Extension Letter, # 3 Exhibit Ex C - Partial Denial, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons)(Dinerstein, Paula) Modified on 11/9/2018 (zef, ). (Entered: 11/08/2018)
2018-11-082LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CONNECTICUT RIVER WATERSHED COUNCIL, INC. (Dinerstein, Paula) Modified event title on 11/28/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 11/08/2018)
2018-11-083MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Ronald Albert Shems, :Firm- Diamond & Robinson, P.C., :Address- 15 East State Street Montpelier, VT 05601-1460. Phone No. - 802-223-6182. Fax No. - 802-229-4457 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5782732. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CONNECTICUT RIVER WATERSHED COUNCIL, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Ronald Shems)(Dinerstein, Paula) Modified on 11/9/2018 (zef, ). (Entered: 11/08/2018)
2018-11-08Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zef, ) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
2018-11-274SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
2018-12-21MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Ronald A. Shems is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this matter. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/21/2018. (lctjk1) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
2018-12-315Consent MOTION to Stay , MOTION for Extension of Time to in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by U.S. FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hudak, Brian) (Entered: 12/31/2018)
2019-01-22MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 5 Consent Motion to Stay. This case shall be stayed until further order of the Court. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report within seven days after funding is restored for the Department of Justice. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/22/2019. (lctjk1) (Entered: 01/22/2019)
2019-01-286NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of U.S. FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-02-017Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-01MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 7 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's 1 Complaint by February 5, 2019. It is further ORDERED that, after Defendant files its response, the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by March 22, 2019. It is further ORDERED that the stay in this case is LIFTED. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 2/1/2019. (lctjk1) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-058ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION.(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 02/05/2019)
2019-03-229Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-03-25MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by April 9, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 3/25/2019. (lctjk1) (Entered: 03/25/2019)
2019-04-0910Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-10MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by May 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/10/2019. (lctjk1) (Entered: 04/10/2019)
2019-05-1511Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 05/15/2019)
2019-05-15MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further status report by June 25, 2019, advising the Court of their progress toward finalizing a settlement, unless a stipulation of dismissal pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) is filed before then. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 5/15/2019. (lctjk1) (Entered: 05/15/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar