Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02579
Date Filed2018-11-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted seven FOIA requests to the Department of State for records concerning the influence of the president and his family's business interests on State policies and activities. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and provided clarification for several requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-11-081COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5783204) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
2018-11-082LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
2018-11-133MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Katherine M. Anthony, :Firm- American Oversight, :Address- 1030 15th St. NW, B255, Washington, DC 20005. Phone No. - (202) 897-3918. Fax No. - (202) 871-6523 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5788208. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
2018-11-13Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsb) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
2018-11-134SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
2018-11-14MINUTE ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave of Katherine M. Anthony to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/14/18. (DMK) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
2018-11-195NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
2018-11-266RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/14/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/14/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/19/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 11/20/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 11/26/2018)
2018-12-137ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 12/13/2018)
2018-12-148ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before January 14, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/14/2018. (lcabj2) (Entered: 12/14/2018)
2019-01-129MOTION to Stay by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Coles-Huff, Doris) (Entered: 01/12/2019)
2019-01-1410RESPONSE re 9 MOTION to Stay filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 01/14/2019)
2019-01-14MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Motion to Stay. Defendant must notify the Court within two business days of the resumption of government operations and propose a revised schedule for current deadlines, if necessary. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/14/2019. (lcabj2) (Entered: 01/14/2019)
2019-01-2911NOTICE of Restored Funding and Proposed Schedule by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE re Order on Motion to Stay, (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-01-29MINUTE ORDER. In light of defendant's notice 11 , the Court's January 14, 2019 minute order granting a stay in this case is hereby lifted. Defendant must file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before February 19, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/29/2019. (lcabj2) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-02-1912STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 02/19/2019)
2019-02-20MINUTE ORDER. In light of defendant's status report 12 , it is ORDERED that production shall begin on April 2, 2019, and a status report is due on April 9, 2019. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/20/19. (lcabj2) (Entered: 02/20/2019)
2019-04-0913Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-10MINUTE ORDER. The parties must file another status report by May 21, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/10/2019. (lcabj2) (Entered: 04/10/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar