Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKortlander v. Bureau of Land Management et al
DistrictDistrict of Montana
CityBillings
Case Number1:2018cv00162
Date Filed2018-11-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Brian Morris
PlaintiffChristoper Kortlander
Case DescriptionChristopher Kortlander, the executive director of the Custer Battlefield Museum, submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning the investigation and prosecution of Robert W. Weaver of Cody, Wyoming, who died in 2016. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Kortlander that it was being put in the complex track for processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Kortlander filed an administrative appeal. After hearing nothing more, Kortlander filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBureau of Land Management
DefendantDepartment of the Interior
DefendantRyan Zinke in his official capacity of Secretary of the Interior
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Opinion/Order [10]
Opinion/Order [13]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-11-131COMPLAINT against Bureau of Land Management, Department of the Interior, Ryan Zinke, filed by Christoper Kortlander. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Civil Cover Sheet) (JDR) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
2018-11-13Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number MTX100015649 (JDR) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
2018-11-132NOTICE OF CASE OPENING (Attachments: # 1 Consent for Electronic Service)(Hard copy w/copy of docket sheet mailed to pro se plaintiff C. Kortlander) (JDR) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
2018-11-133Pro Se Request for Leave to File by E-mail by Christoper Kortlander. (JDR) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
2018-11-154CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE by Christoper Kortlander. (JDR) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
2018-11-165Agreement to Allow Pro Se Party to File by E-Mail. (JEC) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-11-196Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Originals and Docket sheet mailed to Kortlander. (AEC) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
2018-12-187ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Bureau of Land Management, Department of the Interior, Ryan Zinke. (Francis, Victoria) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
2018-12-218Electronic Mailing of Consent Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Victoria L. Francis and Plaintiff Kortlander. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 1/7/2019. (JEC) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
2019-01-109ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. IT IS ORDERED that the above-captioned cause is reassigned to United States District Judge Brian M. Morris with referral to United States Magistrate Judge John T. Johnston pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1). Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 1/10/2019. (EMH) (Entered: 01/10/2019)
2019-01-2210ORDER: Consent to the jurisdiction of the United States Magistrate Judge having been withheld or met with objection, this case remains assigned to Judge Brian M. Morris and referred to Magistrate Judge John T. Johnston. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/22/2019. (JEC) (Entered: 01/22/2019)
2019-03-1211Order: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 4/17/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 4/17/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 4/17/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 4/24/2019 at 02:00 PM in Great Falls, MT before Magistrate Judge John Johnston. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 3/12/2019. (JEC) Modified on 3/12/2019 to remove US Mail service. Plaintiff receives electronic filings. (JEC). (Entered: 03/12/2019)
2019-03-1912Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonic [DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO APPEAR AT PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE BY TELEPHONE] Victoria L. Francis appearing for Defendants Bureau of Land Management, Department of the Interior, Ryan Zinke Motions referred to John Johnston. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Francis, Victoria) (Entered: 03/19/2019)
2019-03-2013ORDER granting 12 Motion for Leave to Appear by telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 3/20/2019. (JEC) (Entered: 03/20/2019)
2019-04-1714PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Bureau of Land Management, Department of the Interior, Ryan Zinke. (Francis, Victoria) (Entered: 04/17/2019)
2019-04-1715DEFENDANTS' PROPOSED STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Bureau of Land Management, Department of the Interior, Ryan Zinke. (Francis, Victoria) Modified on 4/17/2019 to modify CM ECF event to reflect title of document per filer request(EMH). (Entered: 04/17/2019)
2019-04-1716DEFENDANTS' PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Bureau of Land Management, Department of the Interior, Ryan Zinke. (Francis, Victoria) Modified on 4/17/2019 to modify CM ECF filing to reflect title of document per filer request(EMH). (Entered: 04/17/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar