Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02637
Date Filed2018-11-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffBRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE
Case DescriptionThe Brady Center for Gun Violence submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco and Firearms for records concerning changes in ATF Order 5370.1B pertaining to remedies for violations disclosed during Federal gun license inspections. The Brady Center contacted ATF to follow up on its request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Brady Center filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantBUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-11-151COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5793221) filed by BRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Barnett, Kevin) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
2018-11-152LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE (Barnett, Kevin) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
2018-11-15Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zef, ) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-11-163NOTICE OF RELATED CASE. Case related to Case No. 17-cv-2130. (zef, ) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-11-164SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-12-185RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/26/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/26/2018. (Barnett, Kevin) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
2018-12-186NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Arnold Pemberton on behalf of BRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE (Pemberton, Alan) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
2018-12-227STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in this Court's Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/22/2018. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 12/22/2018)
2018-12-268NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
2018-12-269Unopposed MOTION to Stay by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
2018-12-27MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' motion to stay, Dkt. 9 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. This case shall be stayed until further order of the Court. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and submit a revised briefing schedule as soon as Congress appropriates funding for the Department of Justice to resume work. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/27/2018. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 12/27/2018)
2019-02-0410Joint STATUS REPORT by BRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE. (Barnett, Kevin) (Entered: 02/04/2019)
2019-02-0611ANSWER to Complaint by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 02/06/2019)
2019-02-07MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 10 , it is hereby ORDERED that the government shall file its answer on or before February 6, 2019, and that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before March 1, 2019 proposing a final production schedule. It is further ORDERED that, in light of the restoration of funding, this case is hereby UNSTAYED. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/7/2019. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 02/07/2019)
2019-03-0112Joint STATUS REPORT by BRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE. (Barnett, Kevin) (Entered: 03/01/2019)
2019-03-08MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report 12 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before April 5, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/8/2019. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 03/08/2019)
2019-03-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/5/2019. (kt) (Entered: 03/08/2019)
2019-04-0513Joint STATUS REPORT by BRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE. (Barnett, Kevin) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-08MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report 13 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before April 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/8/2019. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 04/08/2019)
2019-04-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/30/2019. (kt) (Entered: 04/08/2019)
2019-04-3014Joint STATUS REPORT by BRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE. (Barnett, Kevin) (Entered: 04/30/2019)
2019-05-02MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report 14 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before June 3, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/2/2019. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 05/02/2019)
2019-05-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/3/2019. (kt) (Entered: 05/02/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar