Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleVoice of San Diego v. United States Department of the Army
DistrictSouthern District of California
CitySan Diego
Case Number3:2018cv02620
Date Filed2018-11-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Janis L. Sammartino
PlaintiffVoice of San Diego
Case DescriptionVoice of San Diego submitted a FOIA request to Los Angeles District of the Department of the Army for records concerning border fences that have been discussed for San Diego and/or Imperial County. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told VOSD that the request was being processed by the Dallas-Ft. Worth district and would take at least six months to process. After hearing nothing further from the agency, VOSD filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of the Army
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-11-151COMPLAINT against United States Department of the Army ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11906956.), filed by Voice of San Diego. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) The new case number is 3:18-cv-2620-JLS-BLM. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Burke, Thomas)(jdt)(sjt). (Entered: 11/15/2018)
2018-11-152Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jdt) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
2018-11-153NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Voice of San Diego. No Parties With Financial Interest. (jdt) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
2018-12-184SUMMONS Returned Executed by Voice of San Diego. Voice of San Diego served. (Burke, Thomas) (jpp). (Entered: 12/18/2018)
2019-01-025ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by United States Department of the Army.(Gardner, Leslie)Attorney Leslie Marie Gardner added to party United States Department of the Army(pty:dft) (acc). (Entered: 01/02/2019)
2019-01-076NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 2/13/2019 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 1/07/2019.(jpp) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
2019-01-087NOTICE of Appearance by Monder Khoury on behalf of Voice of San Diego (Khoury, Monder)Attorney Monder Khoury added to party Voice of San Diego(pty:pla) (jpp). (Entered: 01/08/2019)
2019-01-318NOTICE of Errata re Complaint by Voice of San Diego re 1 Complaint, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Khoury, Monder) (jpp). (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-02-119ORDER continuing Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation Conference continued to 4/24/2019 at 10:00am. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 2/11/2019.(jpp) (Entered: 02/11/2019)
2019-04-2410Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 4/24/2019. Case did not settle. Case Management Conference held on 4/24/2019. Order to follow. (Plaintiff Attorney Thomas Rohlfs Burke). (Defendant Attorney Katherine Parker, Leslie Marie Gardner). (no document attached) (bll) (Entered: 04/24/2019)
2019-04-2611Order Following ENE. Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 4/24/2019.Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2019 at 2:00pm. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/26/2019.(jpp) (Entered: 04/26/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar