Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKNIGHT FIRST AMENDMENT INSTITUTE AT COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY et al v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02709
Date Filed2018-11-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffKNIGHT FIRST AMENDMENT INSTITUTE AT COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY
PlaintiffCOMMITTEE TO PROTECT JOURNALISTS
Case DescriptionThe Knight First Amendment Institute submitted FOIA requests to the CIA, NSA, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, the Department of Justice, and the Department of State for records concerning whether the intelligence agencies learned of the potential threat to Jamil Khashoggi before he was killed. The Knight First Amendment Institute also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. All of the agencies except for the State Department denied the Institute's request for expedited processing. Some agencies denied the Institute's request for a fee waiver, while some either granted or had not made a decision. The Institute filed administrative appeals of the denial of expedited processing. The Justice Department denied the Institute's administrative appeal, while none of the other agencies had acted on the Institute's appeals before the Institute filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantNATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY
DefendantOFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-11-201COMPLAINT Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University against All Defendants Central Intelligence Agency et al ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5802792) filed by KNIGHT FIRST AMENDMENT INSTITUTE AT COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Supplement Corporate Disclosure Form, # 4 Summons CIA, # 5 Summons DOJ, # 6 Summons NSA, # 7 Summons ODNI, # 8 Summons DOS)(Jaffer, Jameel) (Entered: 11/20/2018)
2018-11-20Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zmd) (Entered: 11/21/2018)
2018-11-212LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by KNIGHT FIRST AMENDMENT INSTITUTE AT COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY. (zmd) (Entered: 11/21/2018)
2018-11-263SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 11/26/2018)
2018-11-264STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/26/2018. (lctnm2) (Entered: 11/26/2018)
2018-12-105RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/10/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Tracking numbers, # 2 Delivery confirmation)(Jaffer, Jameel) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-106RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 12/10/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Tracking numbers, # 2 Delivery confirmation)(Jaffer, Jameel) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-107RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 12/10/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Tracking numbers, # 2 Delivery confirmation)(Jaffer, Jameel) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-108RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 12/10/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Tracking numbers, # 2 Delivery confirmation)(Jaffer, Jameel) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-109RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY served on 12/10/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Tracking numbers, # 2 Delivery confirmation)(Jaffer, Jameel) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-1010RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE served on 12/10/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Tracking numbers, # 2 Delivery confirmation)(Jaffer, Jameel) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-1011RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/10/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/9/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Tracking numbers, # 2 Delivery confirmation)(Jaffer, Jameel) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-1412MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Alex Abdo, :Firm- Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, :Address- 475 Riverside Drive, Suite 302, New York, NY 10115. Phone No. - 6467458500. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5839963. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by KNIGHT FIRST AMENDMENT INSTITUTE AT COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jaffer, Jameel) (Entered: 12/14/2018)
2018-12-1413MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Ramya Krishnan, :Firm- Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, :Address- 475 Riverside Drive, Suite 302, New York, NY 10115. Phone No. - 6467458500. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5840037. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by KNIGHT FIRST AMENDMENT INSTITUTE AT COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jaffer, Jameel) (Entered: 12/14/2018)
2018-12-17MINUTE ORDER granting the 12 and 13 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Alex Abdo and Ramya Krishnan shall promptly register for this Court's CM/ECF system. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/17/2018. (lctnm3) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
2019-01-0214NOTICE of Appearance by Antonia Marie Konkoly on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (Konkoly, Antonia) (Entered: 01/02/2019)
2019-01-0215MOTION to Stay All Proceedings by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Konkoly, Antonia) (Entered: 01/02/2019)
2019-01-02MINUTE ORDER granting 15 Motion to Stay. Upon considering the Defendants' 40 Motion to Stay, it is hereby ordered that this matter shall be stayed until Congress has restored appropriations to the Department of Justice. It is further ordered that Defendants will notify the Court immediately upon resumption of appropriations. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/2/2019. (lctnm1) (Entered: 01/02/2019)
2019-01-1716Unopposed MOTION to Lift Stay Temporarily by KNIGHT FIRST AMENDMENT INSTITUTE AT COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B - Corporate Disclosure Form for Committee to Protect Journalists, # 3 Exhibit C - Pro hac vice motion for Adi Kamdar, # 4 Exhibit D - Pro hac vice motion for Jeremy Feigelson, # 5 Exhibit E - Pro hac vice motion for Alexandra P. Swain, # 6 Text of Proposed Order for Motion to Temporarily Lift Stay)(Abdo, Alexander) (Entered: 01/17/2019)
2019-01-17MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Plaintiff's 16 Unopposed Motion, it is hereby ORDERED that (1) the proposed Amended Complaint attached to the 16 Motion is deemed filed as of January 17, 2019; (2) the Disclosure Statement attached to the 16 Motion is deemed filed as of January 17, 2019; and (3) the motions to appear pro hac vice of Adi Kamdar, Jeremy Feigelson, and Alexandra P. Swain are granted. The attorneys shall promptly register with this Court's CM/ECF system. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/17/2019. (lctnm3) (Entered: 01/17/2019)
2019-01-1717AMENDED COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE filed by KNIGHT FIRST AMENDMENT INSTITUTE AT COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY, COMMITTEE TO PROJECT JOURNALISTS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (tth); Modified text on 1/22/2019 (tth). (Entered: 01/18/2019)
2019-01-1718LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by COMMITTEE TO PROJECT JOURNALIST. (tth) (Entered: 01/18/2019)
2019-01-1719MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice : Attorney Name - Adi Kamdar, :Firm- Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University: Address - 475 Riverside Drive, Suite 302, New York, NY 10115. Phone No. - (646) 745-8500. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by KNIGHT FIRST AMENDMENT INSTITUTE AT COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY (tth) (Entered: 01/18/2019)
2019-01-1720MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Attorney Name - Jeremy Feigelson, :Firm - Debevoise & Plimpton LLP : Address - 919 Third Avenue, New York, NY 10022. Phone No. - (212) 909-6000. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by COMMITTEE TO PROJECT JOURNALISTS (tth); Modified text on 1/22/2019 (tth). (Entered: 01/18/2019)
2019-01-1721MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Attorney Name - Alexandra P. Swain : Firm - Debevoise & Plimpton LLP: Address - 919 Third Avenue, New York, NY 10022. Phone No. - (212) 909-6000. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by COMMITTEE TO PROJECT JOURNALISTS. (tth); Modified text on 1/22/2019 (tth). (Entered: 01/18/2019)
2019-01-23Filing fee received: $ 100.00, receipt number: 4616096407; pro hoc vice fee for Alexandra Swain. (tth) (Entered: 01/24/2019)
2019-01-23Filing fee received: $ 100.00, receipt number: 4616096406, pro hoc vice fee for Jeremy Feigelson. (tth) (Entered: 01/24/2019)
2019-01-2822NOTICE to the Court of Restoration of Appropriations by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (Konkoly, Antonia) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-01-29MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Defendants' 22 Notice, the Court hereby lifts the stay in this case. The parties are ORDERED to file a status report on or before February 1, 2019. This Report shall propose a schedule for the filing of Defendants' Answer. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/29/19. (lctnm3) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-01-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/1/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-01-31Filing fee received: $ 100.00, receipt number: 4616096517; pro hoc vice fee for Aditya Kamdar. (tth) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-02-0123Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Konkoly, Antonia) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-01MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 23 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Defendants' shall submit an Answer or response to the Amended Complaint on or before February 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/1/2019. (lctnm3) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' answer or response to the Amended Complaint due by 2/11/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-1124ANSWER to 17 Amended Complaint, by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE.(Konkoly, Antonia) (Entered: 02/11/2019)
2019-02-11MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court are a complaint and an answer in this FOIA case. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule should address, among other things, the status of the Plaintiffs' FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by the Plaintiffs, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if required. The parties shall file the Report on or before March 8, 2019. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/11/2019. (lctnm3) (Entered: 02/11/2019)
2019-02-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/8/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 02/12/2019)
2019-03-0125Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Order by COMMITTEE TO PROTECT JOURNALISTS, KNIGHT FIRST AMENDMENT INSTITUTE AT COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Krishnan, Ramya) (Entered: 03/01/2019)
2019-03-04MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 25 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that: (1) the Central Intelligence Agency and the National Security Agency shall provide a final response to the Plaintiffs' FOIA requests on or before March 15, 2019; (2) the Federal Bureau of Investigation and the Department of State shall provide a final response to the Plaintiffs' FOIA requests on or before March 29, 2019; and (3) the parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before April 12, 2019. This Report shall propose a schedule for dispositive motions if necessary. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/4/2019. (lctnm3) (Entered: 03/04/2019)
2019-03-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Central Intelligence Agency and National Security Agency responses due by 3/15/2019. Federal Bureau of Investigation and Department of State responses due by 3/29/2019. Joint Status Report due by 4/12/2019. (hmc) Modified on 3/5/2019 (hmc). (Entered: 03/05/2019)
2019-04-1226Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Konkoly, Antonia) (Entered: 04/12/2019)
2019-04-13MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 26 Joint Status Report, the following schedule is hereby ordered: (1) the Plaintiffs shall identify all issues and withholdings they plan to challenge to the Defendants on or before May 17, 2019; (2) the Defendants shall file any motion for summary judgment on or before June 21, 2019; (3) the Plaintiffs shall file any cross-motion for summary judgment and their opposition to the Defendants' motion on or before July 19, 2019; (4) the Defendants shall file their reply in support of their own motion and their opposition to the Plaintiffs' motion on or before August 16, 2019; and (5) the Plaintiffs shall file a reply in support of their motion on or before September 6, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/13/2019. (lctnm3) (Entered: 04/13/2019)
2019-04-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs' identification of issues and withholdings due by 5/17/2019. Defendants' motion for summary judgment due by 6/21/2019. Plaintiffs' cross-motion and opposition to Defendants' motion due by 7/19/2019. Defendants' reply in support of their own motion and opposition to Plaintiffs' cross-motion due by 8/16/2019. Plaintiffs' reply in support of their motion due by 9/6/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 04/15/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar