Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCOLORADO WILD PUBLIC LANDS v. UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02781
Date Filed2018-11-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffCOLORADO WILD PUBLIC LANDS
Case DescriptionColorado Wild Public Lands submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning the Blue Valley Ranch Land Exchange. CWPL also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told CWPL that if it narrowed the scope of the request it could be processed more quickly. CWPL said it no longer needed some documents. The agency provided a list of documents responsive to the request, but despite several inquiries about the status of its request, after hearing nothing further from the agency, CWPL filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-11-281COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5812003) filed by COLORADO WILD PUBLIC LANDS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney Civil Process Clerk, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons Defendant U.S. Bureau of Land Management)(Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
2018-11-282LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by COLORADO WILD PUBLIC LANDS (Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
2018-11-28Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zef, ) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
2018-11-293SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
2018-12-074RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/7/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/6/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Return Receipt)(Kenna, Matt) (Main Document 4 replaced on 12/7/2018) (zjf). (Entered: 12/07/2018)
2018-12-075RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT served on 12/6/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Return Receipt)(Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
2018-12-076RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/7/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Return Receipt)(Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar