Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFRIENDS OF THE EARTH et al v. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02837
Date Filed2018-12-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffFRIENDS OF THE EARTH
PlaintiffCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Case DescriptionFriends of the Earth and the Center for Biological Diversity submitted FOIA requests to the EPA for records concerning a series of meetings between EPA officials and staff and outside law firms or companies. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Friends of the Earth and the Center for Biological Diversity filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DefendantU.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-12-041COMPLAINT against ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5820697) filed by FRIENDS OF THE EARTH, CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Rule 26 Certificate, # 3 Summons EPA, # 4 Summons AG, # 5 Summons US Attorney)(Snape, William) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/7/2018) (zef, ). Modified on 12/7/2018 (zef, ). (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-04Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zef, ) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
2018-12-063NOTICE of Appearance by Paulo Antonio Lopes on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lopes, Paulo) (Entered: 12/06/2018)
2018-12-074SUMMONS(3) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
2018-12-115LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FRIENDS OF THE EARTH. (zmd) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
2018-12-116LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (zmd) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar