Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGIBBONS v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02855
Date Filed2018-12-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffCHARLES GIBBONS
Case DescriptionCharles Gibbons, a free-lance journalist, submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning the International Solidarity Movement from 2001 to the present. Gibbons also requested inclusion in the news media fee category. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, told Gibbons it had located 1,396 potentially responsive pages, denied his request for news media fee status, and charged him $55. Gibbons told the agency he would pay the $55, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Gibbons filed a complaint with the Office of Government Information Services. OGIS contacted the FBI and was told that Gibbons' request would be competed by August 2016. In response to later email sent by Gibbons, the FBI told him that his request would be competed in September 2017. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Gibbons filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-12-051COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5823526) filed by CHARLES GIBBONS. (Attachments: # 1 Summons DOJ, # 2 Summons AG, # 3 Summons OUSA, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sobel, David) (Attachment 4 replaced on 12/6/2018) (zef, ). (Entered: 12/05/2018)
2018-12-05Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zef, ) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
2018-12-072SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
2019-01-113Consent MOTION to Stay , MOTION for Extension of Time to in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hudak, Brian) (Entered: 01/11/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar