Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02888
Date Filed2018-12-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Case DescriptionCitizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning the FBI's investigation into who leaked information to Rudy Giuliani pertaining to former FBI director James Comey's decision to reopen the investigation on Hillary Clinton's emails just before the election. CREW also asked for a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted CREW's request for a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency, CREW filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-12-101COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5830056) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons Attorney General, # 4 Summons Department of Justice)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-102LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-12Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zsb) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
2018-12-123SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
2018-12-214RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 12/20/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/18/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/17/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/20/2018. (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
2019-01-025NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 01/02/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar