Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePhillips v. Texas Department of Family Protective Services et al
DistrictNorthern District of Texas
CityDallas
Case Number3:2018cv03298
Date Filed2018-12-14
Date Closed2019-01-14
JudgeSenior Judge Sam R Cummings
PlaintiffDeloris Phillips
DefendantTexas Department of Family Protective Services
DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
AppealFifth Circuit 19-10062
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Opinion/Order [11]
Opinion/Order [15]
Opinion/Order [16]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-12-141New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ramirez (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. (For court use only - links to the national index and to the prior sanctions found within the circuit index.). (ajb) (Entered: 12/14/2018)
2018-12-142MOTION for Leave to File Petitioner's Complaint for Injunctive Relief filed by Deloris Phillips (ajb) (Entered: 12/14/2018)
2018-12-143MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Deloris Phillips (ajb) (Entered: 12/14/2018)
2018-12-174Public Correspondence Requesting ECF Notification filed by Deloris Phillips (Phillips, Deloris) Modified docket text on 12/18/2018 (ajb). Modified event on 12/19/2018 (axm). (Entered: 12/17/2018)
2018-12-195Deputy Clerk Response re 4 Public Correspondence Requesting ECF Notification. (axm) (Entered: 12/19/2018)
2018-12-226MOTION for Summons of Original Complaint filed by Deloris Phillips. (Phillips, Deloris) Modified to add motion event on 12/26/2018 (zkc). (Entered: 12/22/2018)
2018-12-267NOTICE of Related Case AND MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE/TRANSFER CASES re: 1 Judge Cummings (Dallas), 6 MOTION for Summons of Original Complaint filed by Deloris Phillips (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) U.S. AMERICA, ET AL VS. NORTHROP MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (89-C-6111) GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO AMEND COMPLAINT (2 PGS.), # 2 Exhibit(s) JACK PHILLIP (MASTERPIECE CAKESHOP) VS. COLORADO OFFICE OF CIVIL RIGHTS ET AL (3:18-CV-O2074-WYD-STV) 59 PGS., # 3 Exhibit(s) COLORADO OFFICE OF CIVIL RIGHTS MOTION TO DISMISS JACK PHILLIPS VERIFIED COMPLAINT (29 PGS.), # 4 Exhibit(s) ROY & KAYLA MOORE CIVIL COMPLAINT ALLEGING CONSPIRACY TO DERAIL POLITICAL CAREER (14 PGS.), # 5 Exhibit(s) PETITIONER'S FIRST AMENDMENT PROTECTION (10 PGS.)) (Phillips, Deloris) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
2018-12-288FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION on Motion re: 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, 6 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 2 Motion for Leave to File. The motion for leave to proceed with this action, application to proceed without paying fees or costs, and any remaining motions should be DENIED. The Court should order that any pending and future motions filed in this action shall be docketed for administrative purposes only and terminated, and that no action will be taken on those filings while this action remains closed pursuant to the sanctions order. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 12/28/2018) (epm) (Entered: 12/28/2018)
2018-12-319OBJECTION to 8 Findings and Recommendations PETITIONER'S OBJECTION, MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION, MOTION TO REOPEN, AND MOTION FOR HEARING TO MAKE OFFER OF PROOF TO PRESENT EVIDENCE AND TO PRESERVE ERROR. . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) PETITIONER'S SUPPORT FOR MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE NOTICE OF ACCELERATED APPEAL (ORIGINALLY FILED 3:18-CV-1830), # 2 Exhibit(s) PETITIONER'S COPY OF SUBPOENAS FOR MAYOR RAWLINGS AND DIRECT ALL DIRECT PARTIES WHO KNOW OF PREMEDITATED GREEN OAKS AND FABRICATED POLICE REPORT (ORIGINALLY FILED IN DF-18-00541-303RD, # 3 Exhibit(s) PETITIONER'S NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFER OF PROOF ORIGINALLY FILED IN DF-18-00541), # 4 Exhibit(s) PETITIONER'S LETTER BRIEF REGARDING JURISDICTION WITH CITY OF DALLAS AND DPD (ORIGINALLY FILED IN 05-18-00317-CV), # 5 Exhibit(s) PETITIONER'S WRIT OF MANDAMUS FOR RECONSIDERATION/REHEARING FOR DENIED WRIT OF MANDAMUS ENBANC (ORIGINALLY FILED 05-18-00543-CV), # 6 Exhibit(s) PETITIONER'S MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT RECORD ON APPEAL WITH DC-14-06905 (ORIGINALLY FILED IN 05-18-00659-CV), # 7 Exhibit(s) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFER OF PROOF, SUPPORT AND EVIDENCE FOR FINAL TRIAL WITH ATTACHED OFFER OF PROOF AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS (ORIGINALLY FILED IN DF-18-00541-3O03RD), # 8 Exhibit(s) PETITIONER' SFIRST AMENDMENT PROTECTION) (Phillips, Deloris) (Entered: 12/31/2018)
2019-01-0310CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deloris Phillips. (rekc) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
2019-01-1411Order Adopting 8 Findings, Conclusions and Recommendation. Plaintiff's objections are overruled. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 1/14/2019) (rekc) (Entered: 01/14/2019)
2019-01-1412JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the above-styled and-numbered civil action be dismissed without prejudice (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 1/14/2019) (rekc) (Entered: 01/14/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar