Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDBW PARTNERS, LLC v. UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv03127
Date Filed2018-12-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffDBW PARTNERS, LLC
doing business as CAPITOL FORUM
Case DescriptionDBW Partners, which operates Capital Forum, a subscription news service, submitted a FOIA request to the U.S Postal Service for records concerning an ethics investigation into the propriety of an interview given by then Chief Customer and Marketing Officer James Cochrane to Stamps.com. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but denied it on the basis of Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy). DBW Partners filed an administrative appeal, but the agency upheld its original decision. Capital Forum also submitted a FOIA request to the OIG's office for a report concerning the role of middlemen and discounts in the USPS package business. The agency acknowledged receipt of that request, but denied it under Exemption 3 (other statutes). Capital Forum filed an administrative appeal, which was denied. DBW Partners then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
DefendantUNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Opinion/Order [18]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-12-281COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5861146) filed by DBW PARTNERS, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons USPS, # 6 Summons OIG, # 7 Summons AG, # 8 Summons US Attorney)(Williams, John) (Entered: 12/28/2018)
2018-12-282LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DBW PARTNERS, LLC (Williams, John) (Entered: 12/28/2018)
2018-12-31Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zef, ) (Entered: 12/31/2018)
2018-12-313SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 12/31/2018)
2019-01-114RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General January 4, 2019. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of delivery)(Williams, John) (Entered: 01/11/2019)
2019-01-115RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE served on 1/4/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Proof of delivery)(Williams, John) (Entered: 01/11/2019)
2019-01-186RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/4/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/3/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Delivery)(Williams, John) (Entered: 01/18/2019)
2019-02-017RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL served on 1/3/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Delivery)(Williams, John) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-048NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Cirino on behalf of UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 02/04/2019)
2019-02-049ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL.(Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 02/04/2019)
2019-02-05MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a status report, including a proposed briefing schedule, by February 19, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on February 5, 2019. (lcrc2) (Entered: 02/05/2019)
2019-02-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 2/19/2019 (tj) (Entered: 02/05/2019)
2019-02-1510Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 02/15/2019)
2019-02-15MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 10 the parties' Joint Status Report, the following briefing schedule is hereby ORDERED: Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed by April 19, 2019. Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendants' motion shall be filed by May 16, 2019. Defendants' Reply and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion shall be filed by June 14, 2019. And Plaintiff's Reply shall be filed by June 28, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on February 15, 2019. (lcrc2, ) (Entered: 02/15/2019)
2019-03-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 5/16/2019. Response to Cross Motions due by 6/14/2019. Reply to Cross Motions due by 6/28/2019. Summary Judgment motions due by 4/19/2019. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/16/2019. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/14/2019. (tj) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-04-1911MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration of Dennis Nicoski, # 4 Declaration of Elizabeth P. Martin, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 04/19/2019)
2019-05-1512Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment by DBW PARTNERS, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration, # 4 Declaration, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, John) (Entered: 05/15/2019)
2019-05-1513Memorandum in opposition to re 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DBW PARTNERS, LLC. (See Docket Entry 12 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
2019-06-1414Memorandum in opposition to re 12 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL. (Attachments: # 1 Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Facts, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
2019-06-1415REPLY to opposition to motion re 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL. (Attachments: # 1 Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Facts)(Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
2019-06-2816REPLY to opposition to motion re 12 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by DBW PARTNERS, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Williams, John) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-10-2817ORDER denying 11 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and granting in part and denying in part 12 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/28/2019. (lcrc2) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
2019-10-2818MEMORANDUM AND OPINION denying 11 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and granting in part and denying in part 12 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/28/2019. (lcrc2) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar