Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSCARLETT v. NATIONAL SCIENCE FOUNDATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00025
Date Filed2019-01-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffCAROL SCARLETT
Case DescriptionCarol Scarlett, whose small business was denied a Small Business Innovation Research grant by the National Science Foundation, submitted a FOIA request to NSF for records concerning why she was denied the grant. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Scarlett filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNATIONAL SCIENCE FOUNDATION
2415 Eisenhower Avenue
Alexandria, VA 22314
DefendantNATIONAL SCIENCE FOUNDATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-01-041COMPLAINT against NATIONAL SCIENCE FOUNDATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5870804) filed by CAROL SCARLETT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Montalvo, Eric) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
2019-01-07Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zef, ) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
2019-01-072SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL SCIENCE FOUNDATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
2019-02-143NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Field on behalf of All Defendants (Field, Brian) (Entered: 02/14/2019)
2019-02-144ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL SCIENCE FOUNDATION.(Field, Brian) (Entered: 02/14/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar