Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMunger v. Social Security Administration
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2019cv00012
Date Filed2019-01-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James L. Robart
PlaintiffMatthew Munger a single man, by and through his attorney-in-fact
other Steven Munger
Case DescriptionMatthew Munger, who was mentally-disabled, submitted a FOIA request through Steven Munger, to the Social Security Administration for records concerning an accident he had at the Social Security Office in Longview, WA. The agency told Munger's attorney that it was exempt from liability because of a consent authorization. The agency then told Munger's attorney that it would administratively close his FOIA request. Munger then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantSocial Security Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-01-041COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief and Award of Statutory Fees and Costs against defendant(s) All Plaintiffs (Receipt # 0981-5602631) Attorney Brandon K. Batchelor added to party Matthew Munger(pty:pla), filed by Matthew Munger. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Batchelor, Brandon) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
2019-01-07Judge James L. Robart added. (SNP) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
2019-01-072NOTICE TO FILER: re 1 Complaint,. Notice of Filing Deficiency ** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (SNP) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
2019-01-073Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Social Security Administration (SNP) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
2019-01-074CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Plaintiff Matthew Munger. (Batchelor, Brandon) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
2019-01-095SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant All Defendants (Batchelor, Brandon) (Entered: 01/09/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar