Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePOWELL v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00044
Date Filed2019-01-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffWILLIAM E. POWELL
DefendantSOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-01-03Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 1/3/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmd) (Entered: 01/09/2019)
2019-01-031COMPLAINT against SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION filed by WILLIAM E. POWELL. (zmd) (Entered: 01/09/2019)
2019-01-032MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by WILLIAM E. POWELL (zmd) (Entered: 01/09/2019)
2019-01-113FIAT ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. "Leave to file without prepayment of costs GRANTED." Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/11/2019. (zmd) (Entered: 01/18/2019)
2019-01-184NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by WILLIAM E. POWELL. Case related to Case No. 17-cv-278, 18-cv-453. (zmd) (Entered: 01/18/2019)
2019-01-18Case Reassigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (zmd) (Entered: 01/18/2019)
2019-01-22MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the Clerk's Office shall direct the U.S. Marshals Service to effect service on Defendant. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/22/2019. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 01/22/2019)
2019-01-255MOTION for CM/ECF Password by WILLIAM E. POWELL (ztd) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-01-29MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 5 Motion for CM/ECF Password. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/29/2019. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-02-016SUMMONS (3) Issued as to SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (zef) (Main Document 6 replaced on 2/4/2019) (zef, ). (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-217MOTION to Enforce SSA SUMMONS by WILLIAM E. POWELL (POWELL, WILLIAM) (Main Document 7 replaced on 2/27/2019 to correct case year) (jf). (Entered: 02/21/2019)
2019-02-21MINUTE ORDER: A conference call is hereby set for Wednesday, February 27, 2019, at 11:30 a.m. to discuss Plaintiff's in forma pauperis status. The Court ORDERS that the parties shall jointly call Chambers at (202) 354-3300 at this time (in Chambers). So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/21/2019. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 02/21/2019)
2019-02-21Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 2/27/2019 at 11:30 AM in Chambers before Judge James E. Boasberg. (znbn) (Entered: 02/22/2019)
2019-02-228RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/7/2019. (tth) (Entered: 02/27/2019)
2019-02-27MINUTE ORDER: As discussed in today's conference call from chambers and with the parties' consent, the Court ORDERS that: 1) The case is STAYED until further Order of the Court; and 2) The parties shall submit a joint status report regarding the progress of their negotiations by March 29, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/27/2019. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 02/27/2019)
2019-02-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/29/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 02/28/2019)
2019-02-27Case Stayed. (znbn) (Entered: 02/28/2019)
2019-03-089RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/19/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/21/2019. (tth) (Entered: 03/11/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar